Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-20251

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Andrew B Altenburg Jr
Case #: 1:23-ap-01065
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2023
Terminated:Jul 21, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kimberly A. Lehner
508 Betsy Dr
Glendora, NJ 08029
Represented By
Kimberly A. Lehner
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Ann Lehner
Represented By
Kimberly Ann Lehner
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Ann Galanti
Represented By
Kimberly Ann Galanti
contact info
Defendant
SKL Contracting
Represented By
SKL Contracting
contact info
Plaintiff
John Pickeral
70 Burnt Hill Road
Skillman, NJ 08558
Represented By
Salvatore P DiFazio
The Difazio Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheridan Hotung-Pickeral
70 Burnt Hill Road
Skillman, NJ 08558
Represented By
Salvatore P DiFazio
The Difazio Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, July 21, 2023
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 07/21 10:40 AM
Adversary Case (1:23-ap-1065) Closed. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
4 4 order Dismissing Case Wed 06/28 2:22 PM
Order Dismissing Case Related [+]. re: Lack of Prosecution. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/28/2023. (har)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause (Upload)
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
court Hearing Held Tue 06/27 2:25 PM
Minute of 6/27/2023 hearing, OUTCOME: No opposition. No default, case to be dismissed. Related [+] (AnthonySodono)
Related: [-] 3 Order to Show Cause (Upload)
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
3 3 order Show Cause (Upload) Tue 06/06 2:12 PM
Order to Show Cause re: Lack of Prosecution. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/6/2023. Show Cause hearing to be held on 6/27/2023 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (har)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Tue 06/06 1:53 PM
Minute of 6/6/623 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: OSC to be signed for lack of prosecution. Related [+] (har)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, March 02, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 03/02 2:35 PM
Summons Issued to John Pickeral, Sheridan Hotung-Pickeral for Service on Kimberly Ann Galanti Answer due on 4/3/2023; Kimberly A. Lehner Answer due on 4/3/2023; Kimberly Ann Lehner Answer due on 4/3/2023; SKL Contracting Answer due on 4/3/2023 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/6/2023 at 02:00 PM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. (lgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
utility Add Party Thu 03/02 2:36 PM
Isabel C. Balboa, Interested Party, added to case (lgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/01 4:29 PM
Adversary case 23-01065 Complaint by John Pickeral, Sheridan Hotung-Pickeral against Kimberly A. Lehner ; Kimberly Ann Lehner ; Kimberly Ann Galanti ; SKL Contracting. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (DiFazio, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons