Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Roy B Dalton, Jr
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:23-cv-00383
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2023
Terminated:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 31, 2023 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Nova King, Inc.
Represented By
Holly Woersching Zitzka
Cobb Cole
contact info
Plaintiff
Janet Hoyt
Represented By
Ariel Lett
Lett Law, PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Arias
The Onyx Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Friday, June 30, 2023
26 26 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 06/30 3:10 PM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re 25 Stipulation of Dismissal. All pending motions are denied as moot and all deadlines and hearings are terminated. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/30/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/28 2:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Janet Hoyt. (Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
24 24 2 pgs order Order to Strike Tue 06/27 2:57 PM
ORDER to strike re: 23 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Janet Hoyt. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/27/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/20 1:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Janet Hoyt. (Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/19 2:24 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by Nova King, Inc..(Zitzka, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
utility *Remark Tue 04/04 3:12 PM
Remark: Doc.17 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/3/2023. (EP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 03/29 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jonathan Arias on behalf of Janet Hoyt. Lead Counsel: Jonathan Arias. (Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/29 11:28 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Nova King, Inc. (Zitzka, Holly) Modified on 3/29/2023 to edit docket text (SRD)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 03/29 8:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER TO STRIKE Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons (Doc. 13). The filing fails to comply with the amended disclosure form again, which went into effect December 1, 2022. https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/forms/all/civil-forms. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Doc. 13 from the docket and Defendant is DIRECTED to file a compliant form by Wednesday, April 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/29/2023. (EP)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 03/29 12:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ariel Lett and Jonathan Arias of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/29 12:31 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Nova King, Inc. shal file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 19, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/29/2023. (Norway, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/28 4:03 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Nova King, Inc.. (Zitzka, Holly)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/28 4:01 PM
NOTICE by Nova King, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions (Zitzka, Holly)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/28 3:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nova King, Inc.. (Zitzka, Holly)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/28 3:58 PM
NOTICE by Nova King, Inc. of Appearance of Counsel (Zitzka, Holly)
Related: [-]
11 11 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Tue 03/28 3:15 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:5 Case Management Scheduling Order by Janet Hoyt. (Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
utility *Remark Wed 03/15 3:45 PM
Remark: Doc.8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/15/2023. (EP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
9 9 service Summons returned executed Tue 03/14 7:50 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/8/2023 by Janet Hoyt as to Nova King, Inc.. (Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/14 6:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Order by Janet Hoyt. (Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/14 6:23 PM
NOTICE by Janet Hoyt re4 Order Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/08 4:02 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:23-cv-383-RBD-RMN. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (RN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
5 5 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 03/06 6:19 PM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/6/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
4 4 12 pgs order Order Mon 03/06 6:19 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/6/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
3 3 service Summons issued Fri 03/03 10:58 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Nova King, Inc. (LDJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/02 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVA KING INC (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20567736) filed by Janet Hoyt.(Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Supplement Notice of Appearance
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/02 2:52 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:23-cv-0383-RBD-DAB. (SJB)
Related: [-]