Hoyt v. Nova King, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Roy B Dalton, Jr |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:23-cv-00383 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 31, 2023 5:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nova King, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Hoyt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re 25 Stipulation of Dismissal. All pending motions are denied as moot and all deadlines and hearings are terminated. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/30/2023. (ALL) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Janet Hoyt. (Arias, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER to strike re: 23 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Janet Hoyt. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/27/2023. (ALL) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Janet Hoyt. (Arias, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by Nova King, Inc..(Zitzka, Holly) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
utility
*Remark
Tue 04/04 3:12 PM
Remark: Doc.17 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/3/2023. (EP) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jonathan Arias on behalf of Janet Hoyt. Lead Counsel: Jonathan Arias. (Arias, Jonathan) |
|
17 | 17
![]() CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Nova King, Inc. (Zitzka, Holly) Modified on 3/29/2023 to edit docket text (SRD) |
|
order
Order
Wed 03/29 8:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER TO STRIKE Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons (Doc. 13). The filing fails to comply with the amended disclosure form again, which went into effect December 1, 2022. https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/forms/all/civil-forms. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Doc. 13 from the docket and Defendant is DIRECTED to file a compliant form by Wednesday, April 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/29/2023. (EP) |
||
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/29 12:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ariel Lett and Jonathan Arias of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 03/29 12:31 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Nova King, Inc. shal file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 19, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/29/2023. (Norway, Robert) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Nova King, Inc.. (Zitzka, Holly) |
|
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE by Nova King, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions (Zitzka, Holly) |
|
13 | 13
![]() CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nova King, Inc.. (Zitzka, Holly) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE by Nova King, Inc. of Appearance of Counsel (Zitzka, Holly) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to court interrogatories re:5 Case Management Scheduling Order by Janet Hoyt. (Arias, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
utility
*Remark
Wed 03/15 3:45 PM
Remark: Doc.8 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/15/2023. (EP) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() RETURN of service executed on 3/8/2023 by Janet Hoyt as to Nova King, Inc.. (Arias, Jonathan) |
|
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Order by Janet Hoyt. (Arias, Jonathan) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE by Janet Hoyt re4 Order Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Arias, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/08 4:02 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:23-cv-383-RBD-RMN. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (RN) |
||
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/6/2023. (ALL) |
|
4 | 4
![]() INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/6/2023. (ALL) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS issued as to Nova King, Inc. (LDJ) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against NOVA KING INC (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20567736) filed by Janet Hoyt.(Arias, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/02 2:52 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:23-cv-0383-RBD-DAB. (SJB) |