Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Mark R Hornak
Case #: 2:23-cv-00343
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2023
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 28, 2023 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
MCLANE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
John T. Pion
Pion, Nerone, Girman, Winslow & Smith
contact info
Julie A. Brennan
Pion Nerone Girman Winslow & Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
MCLANE FOODSERVICE DISTRIBUTION, INC
Represented By
John T. Pion
Pion, Nerone, Girman, Winslow & Smith
contact info
Julie A. Brennan
Pion Nerone Girman Winslow & Smith PC
contact info
Defendant
MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.
Represented By
John T. Pion
Pion, Nerone, Girman, Winslow & Smith
contact info
Julie A. Brennan
Pion Nerone Girman Winslow & Smith PC
contact info
Mediator
Howard J Schulberg
Schulberg Mediation LLC 1174 Harvard Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205
Represented By
Howard J. Schulberg
Schulberg Mediation
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERTA C. ARMBRUSTER
Represented By
John Eric Nedlik
Woomer & Talarico, LLC
contact info
Richard G. Talarico
Woomer & Talarico, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
HOWARD J. SCHULBERG
Terminated: 05/30/2023
Schulberg Mediation LLC 515 Hamilton Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205
Represented By
Howard J. Schulberg
Schulberg Mediation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 19, 2024
55 55 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/19 3:58 PM
ORDER APPROVING54 Stipulation for Discontinuance. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/19/24. (bdb)
Related: [-]
54 54 misc Stipulation Thu 09/19 10:15 AM
STIPULATION by ROBERTA C. ARMBRUSTER. (Talarico, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
53 53 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/17 10:30 AM
ORDER APPROVING52 Stipulation for Discontinuance. It is hereby ORDERED that this matter is hereby DISCONTINUED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/17/24. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
52 52 misc Stipulation Mon 09/16 12:18 PM
STIPULATION by ROBERTA C. ARMBRUSTER. (Talarico, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order