ARMBRUSTER v. MCLANE COMPANY, INC. et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark R Hornak |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00343 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 28, 2023 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
MCLANE COMPANY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MCLANE FOODSERVICE DISTRIBUTION, INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MCLANE FOODSERVICE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Howard J Schulberg
Schulberg Mediation LLC 1174 Harvard Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERTA C. ARMBRUSTER
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Mediator
HOWARD J. SCHULBERG
Terminated: 05/30/2023
Schulberg Mediation LLC 515 Hamilton Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
![]() ORDER APPROVING54 Stipulation for Discontinuance. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/19/24. (bdb) |
|
54 | 54
![]() STIPULATION by ROBERTA C. ARMBRUSTER. (Talarico, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
53 | 53
![]() ORDER APPROVING52 Stipulation for Discontinuance. It is hereby ORDERED that this matter is hereby DISCONTINUED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/17/24. (bdb) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
52 | 52
![]() STIPULATION by ROBERTA C. ARMBRUSTER. (Talarico, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |