New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Referred: Sarah L Cave
Case #: 1:23-cv-01874
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 01, 2023 5:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Jessica Bagby
Represented By
Alyson Zureick
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Debo Patrick Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Alan Schoenfeld
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Robert Cairo
Represented By
Alyson Zureick
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Debo Patrick Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Alan Schoenfeld
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
John and Jane Does
Defendant
Ethical Culture Fieldston School
Represented By
Alyson Zureick
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Debo Patrick Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Alan Schoenfeld
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Nigel Furlonge
Represented By
Alyson Zureick
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Debo Patrick Adegbile
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Alan Schoenfeld
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Josephine DeJesus
Represented By
Derek S. Sells
The Cochran Firm
contact info
John David Lenoir
John D. Lenoir, Attorney
contact info
Nathaniel B. Smith
Nathaniel B. Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Serene R. Wright
Represented By
Derek S. Sells
The Cochran Firm
contact info
John David Lenoir
John D. Lenoir, Attorney
contact info
Nathaniel B. Smith
Nathaniel B. Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
98 98 misc Letter Mon 03/17 4:41 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Nathaniel B. Smith dated March 17, 2025 re: correction. Document filed by Josephine DeJesus, Serene R. Wright..(Smith, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Correction
Friday, March 14, 2025
97 97 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 03/14 6:45 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:82 CROSS MOTION Enforce Charging Lien re:62 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement . .,62 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement . . Document filed by Serene R. Wright, Josephine DeJesus.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 78 .(Sells, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Derek S. Sells, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email
Thursday, March 13, 2025
96 96 order Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/13 12:31 PM
ORDER dismissing26 Letter Motion to Seal and27 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement: The motions at ECF Nos.26 and27 are hereby dismissed as moot in light of the updated motion to enforce the settlement agreement at ECF No.62 . (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]