Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott M Grossman
Case #: 0:23-bk-11738
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2023
Claims Deadline:May 15, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Oct 11, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Green Roads, Inc.
601 Fairway Drive
Deerfield Beach, FL 33441
Represented By
Jonathan H Kaskel
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
284 284 order Extend Time Order Wed 05/07 12:56 PM
Order Extending Deadline to Object to Claims Related [+] (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-] # 273
283 283 order Objection to Claims Order Wed 05/07 12:52 PM
Order Granting Debtors Objection to Claim No. 21-1 Filed by David Fuentes Related [+] (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-] # 268
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
282 282 order Objection to Claims Order Tue 05/06 12:11 PM
Order Granting Debtors Third Omnibus Objection to Founders Claims as Defined in The Plan Related [+] (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-] # 271
281 281 order Objection to Claims Order Tue 05/06 12:10 PM
Order Granting Debtors Second Omnibus Objection to Founders Claims as Defined in The Plan Related [+] (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-] # 270
280 280 order Objection to Claims Order Tue 05/06 11:29 AM
Order Granting Debtors First Omnibus Objection to Founders Claims as Defined in The Plan Related [+] (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-] # 269
279 279 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Tue 05/06 11:19 AM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Ex-Parte Motion to Allow Claim No. 28-01 Filed by Tamera Industries, Inc (I) in an Amount Different Than Scheduled; and (II) in an Amount Less Than Filed Related [+] (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-] # 272
Monday, May 05, 2025
278 278 ordertext Order Granting (TEXT ONLY) Mon 05/05 9:41 AM
Order Granting 277 Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely on 5/7/2025 at 01:30 Related [+]] filed by Other Professional Soneet Kapila. ***Counsel James R. Irving's motion to appear remotely at the May 7, 2025 hearing in this case is GRANTED .*** SO ORDERED by Judge Scott M Grossman . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). (Garciga, Katelyn)
Related: [-] 247 Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference
Sunday, May 04, 2025
277 277 motion Appear Remotely (Ex Parte) Sun 05/04 11:33 PM
Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely on 5/7/2025 at 01:30 Related [+]] Filed by Other Professional Soneet Kapila (Irving, James)
Related: [-] 247 Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference