Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-04935
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 02, 2023 7:00 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
ELIJAH MORRIS
Represented By
RHETT MCSWEENEY
Mcsweeney Langevin Llc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 10, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/10 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by RHETT MCSWEENEY on behalf of ELIJAH MORRIS (MCSWEENEY, RHETT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
misc Docket Annotation Wed 03/08 8:56 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO COUNSEL - PLEASE DO NOT POST OR USE THE CIVIL EVENT "REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT" WHEN DIRECT FILING A CASE. JUDGES DO NOT GET ASSIGNED AND YOU ARE NOT PROMPTED FOR FILING FEE. DE1 WILL BE EDITED TO READ COMPLAINT AND REGENERATED. Re1 Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only filed by ELIJAH MORRIS (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/08 8:59 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON added. (djb)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 03/08 9:01 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: To Pay the civil filing fee counsel must select "Filing Fee for Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) Case" as the event. Re1 Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only filed by ELIJAH MORRIS (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
1 1 cmp Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only Tue 03/07 11:25 AM
REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT Morris against 3M COMPANY, filed by ELIJAH MORRIS. (MCSWEENEY, RHETT)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee for Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) Case Wed 03/08 9:43 AM
Payment of Filing Fee (Filing fee $402.) Receipt # AFLNDC-7743437, filed by ELIJAH MORRIS. (entered on behalf of counsel, RHETT MCSWEENEY) (djb) Modified on 3/8/2023 (djb)
Related: [-]