North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 7:23-cv-00195
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 02, 2023 6:38 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
LaCresha A. Johnson
Doj-Civ
contact info
Geoffrey C. Cook
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environmental Tort Branch
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Peter Lee Ehlenberger
Represented By
Eric W. Flynn
Bell Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 19, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/19 1:50 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Anna Ellison on behalf of United States of America. (Ellison, Anna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 1:07 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Hanley W. Gibbons on behalf of United States of America. (Gibbons, Hanley)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/05 5:05 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Roberts, III on behalf of Peter Lee Ehlenberger. (Roberts, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
16 16 5 pgs order Order Fri 02/02 10:03 AM
TRACK 1 ORDER - IN RE: CAMP LEJEUNE WATER LITIGATION. Counsel is directed to read this Order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II, District Judge Terrence W. Boyle, District Judge Louise W. Flanagan, and District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/1/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/17 5:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Sara Johanna Mirsky on behalf of United States of America. (Mirsky, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/05 12:33 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Cindy Marie Hurt on behalf of United States of America. (Hurt, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/28 11:06 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Platt on behalf of United States of America. (Platt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/20 5:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected Short Form against United States of America, filed by Peter Lee Ehlenberger. (Bell, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/06 4:05 PM
SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Peter Lee Ehlenberger. (Bell, James) Modified to correct text on 11/6/2023 Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/19 4:34 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Traci C McKeever on behalf of United States of America. (McKeever, Traci)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 10/17 1:09 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by James Edward Bell, III on behalf of Peter Lee Ehlenberger. (Bell, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Thu 10/12 3:23 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by Peter Lee Ehlenberger. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Drop Box Receipt
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/12 3:25 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney J. Edward Bell, III must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/12/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Friday, September 29, 2023
7 7 notice Notice-other Fri 09/29 9:55 PM
Notice filed by United States of America NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF GOVERNMENT COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LCR 5.2(d) . (Johnson, LaCresha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
order Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 08/30 10:46 AM
TEXT ORDER In keeping with the scope and tenor of the Master Docket Orders (7:23-cv-897), the court ORDERS an extension of time for the Defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including October 2, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 8/30/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Monday, July 24, 2023
order Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 07/24 2:34 PM
TEXT ORDER In keeping with the scope and tenor of the Master Docket Orders (7:23-cv-897), the court ORDERS an extension of time for the Defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including September 1, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 7/24/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
order Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 06/20 3:46 PM
TEXT ORDER In keeping with the scope and tenor of the Master Docket Orders (7:23-cv-897), the court ORDERS an extension of time for the Defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including August 4, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 6/20/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
order Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/03 10:39 AM
TEXT ORDER - In keeping with the scope and tenor of the Master Docket Order (7:23-cv-897), the court GRANTS an extension of time for the Defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including June 23, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 5/3/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
utility Motion Submitted Tue 05/02 3:04 PM
Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Monday, May 01, 2023
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/01 6:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by United States of America. (Johnson, LaCresha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 24, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/24 12:32 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Geoffrey C. Cook on behalf of United States of America. (Cook, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/17 3:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by LaCresha A. Johnson on behalf of United States of America. (Johnson, LaCresha)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 03/06 12:26 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Peter Lee Ehlenberger (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/06 12:26 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of Peter Lee Ehlenberger. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/06 12:25 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6974914.), filed by Peter Lee Ehlenberger. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Mon 03/06 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra