Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:23-cv-00402
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2023
Terminated:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 02, 2023 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
David S. Blau
Blau Keane Law Group P.C.
contact info
James K. Powers
Mcgee & Powers, PA
contact info
Ron L. Nelson
Blau Keane Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Colony Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Lena Marguerite Mirilovic
Roberts Tate LLC
contact info
Parker J. Lavin
Roberts Tate, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
38 38 order Order Tue 11/21 1:34 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re 35 Notice of Settlement & 36 Court Order. The time for filing a stipulation of dismissal has now passed. Accordingly, the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/21/2023. (ND)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
37 37 notice Notice of change of address Wed 09/20 12:12 PM
NOTICE of change of address by Lena Marguerite Mirilovic (Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
36 36 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/19 4:48 PM
ORDER re 35 Notice of Settlement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/19/2023. (ABP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
35 35 adr Mediation report Mon 09/18 4:44 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 9/18/2023. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Fleming, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
34 34 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 08/11 1:02 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 18, 2023 before Jeffrey M. Fleming, Esq.. (Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/17 11:06 AM
NOTICE by Colony Specialty Insurance Company Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Lavin, Parker)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
32 32 adr Notice of selection of mediator Mon 06/19 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Rodney Romano, Esq. as mediator by Colony Specialty Insurance Company. (Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
31 31 misc Declaration Tue 06/13 1:08 PM
DECLARATION of Ronald L. Nelson re23 Order to show cause,12 Order to comply with electronic filing by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Blau, David)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/13 9:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ronald Laurence Nelson is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 6/13/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/08 3:52 PM
ORDER directing the parties to confer and advise the Court on the selection of a mediator within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/8/2023. (GNB)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 06/08 3:50 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2023 Joinder of Parties due by 7/17/2023 Discovery due by 2/5/2024 Dispositive motions due by 3/4/2024 Pretrial statement due by 6/17/2024 All other motions due by 6/24/2024 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/4/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/2/2024 Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2024 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Bench Trial set for 8/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/19/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/8/2023. (GNB)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/08 2:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Ronald L. Nelson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20921544 for $150 by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Blau, David)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Case Management Report Thu 06/08 8:18 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lavin, Parker)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 06/08 3:44 PM
ENDORSED ORDER discharging 23 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/8/2023. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
24 24 misc Response to order to show cause Mon 06/05 2:42 PM
Joint RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re21 Order to show cause filed by Colony Specialty Insurance Company. (Lavin, Parker) Modified on 6/5/2023 to edit docket text (SRD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order to show cause Fri 06/02 2:03 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Attorney Ron Nelson has failed to comply with the Court's Order 12 . Mr. Nelson shall show cause within fourteen (14) days why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply. Failure to respond to this Order will result in the imposition of sanctions without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/2/2023. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
22 22 misc Declaration Tue 05/30 8:26 PM
DECLARATION of David S. Blau re13 Order to show cause, by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Blau, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order to show cause Thu 05/25 11:25 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Colony Specialty Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company. The parties have failed to file a Case Management Report within the time required by Local Rule 3.02(b). The parties are hereby DIRECTED to file a written response within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why this case should not be dismissed, pursuant to Local Rule 3.10, for lack of prosecution due to the non-filing of a Case Management Report within the time prescribed by Local Rule 3.02(b). Failure to respond to this Order may result in a dismissal of this action or the imposition of other appropriate sanctions without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/25/2023. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 05/12 7:53 PM
NOTICE of a related action /Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.07(c) by United Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Blau, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/12 7:42 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State National Insurance Company for United Specialty Insurance Company. (Blau, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 05/04 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by James K. Powers on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: David S. Blau. (Powers, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/04 2:01 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by United Specialty Insurance Company.(Powers, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/03 12:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for David Seth Blau to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20792845 for $150 by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Powers, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 05/03 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Lena Marguerite Mirilovic on behalf of Colony Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Parker J. Lavin. (Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/03 1:39 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Seth Blau is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/3/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order to show cause Tue 05/02 2:20 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to United Specialty Insurance Company. Defendant has failed to comply with the Court's Order 3 . Defendant shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions without further notice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/2/2023. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order to comply with electronic filing Mon 05/01 9:57 AM
ORDER for Ron Nelson to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/1/2023. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/21 11:01 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Parker J. Lavin is granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/21/2023. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/20 4:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Parker J. Lavin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20749038 for $150 by Colony Specialty Insurance Company. (Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
9 9 service Waiver of service executed Wed 04/05 3:42 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/5/2023 by Colony Specialty Insurance Company as to United Specialty Insurance Company. (Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 03/20 11:20 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Colony Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 03/10 11:22 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lena Marguerite Mirilovic of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
6 6 order Standing Order Thu 03/09 2:37 PM
STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/07 2:57 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Colony Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Colony Insurance Company for Colony Specialty Insurance Company.. (Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
3 3 12 pgs order Order Tue 03/07 10:11 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/7/2023. (GNB)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 03/07 10:41 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Parker J. Lavin Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-0402-PGB-DCI. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/06 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT for Equitable Subrogation and Contribution against United Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20578491) filed by Colony Specialty Insurance Company.(Mirilovic, Lena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - USIC Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - CSIC Umbrella Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Grantley Complaint,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/06 4:41 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-0402-PGB-DCI. (SJB)
Related: [-]