California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:23-cv-01659
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 02, 2023 3:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Watermark Retirement Communities, LLC
Represented By
Darren K Cottriel
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Joseph DeCarlo
Represented By
Guy B Wallace
Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP
contact info
Kathryn Ann Stebner
Stebner Gertler Guadagni And Kawamoto Aplc
contact info
Brian S Umpierre
Stebner Gertler Guadagni And Kawamoto Aplc
contact info
Mark Thomas Johnson
Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP
contact info
Jennifer Uhrowczik Bybee
Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky Wotkyns LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
33 33 11 pgs order Settlement Wed 03/19 9:16 AM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement28 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
32 32 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 03/18 4:42 PM
DECLARATION of Brian S. Umpierre in further support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 28 filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo.(Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order (redline),
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order (clean),
Att: 3 Exhibit Long Form Class Notice (redline),
Att: 4 Exhibit Short Form Class Notice (redline)
Monday, March 17, 2025
31 31 minutes Motion Hearing Settlement Tue 03/18 10:02 AM
MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT28 (Non-Evidentiary Held and Completed) before Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Court orders that counsel provide a revised, redlined proposed order granting a motion for preliminary approval. The revised order should include appropriate timeframes and dates. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 03/06 1:07 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Motion for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement28 set for 3/10/2025 at 1:30 PM is continued to 3/17/2025 at 1:30 PM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
29 29 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 02/21 1:12 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement 28 filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo.(Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 10, 2025
28 28 motion Settlement Mon 02/10 7:07 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. Motion set for hearing on 3/10/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Brian S. Umpierre in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Joseph DeCarlo in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of Cristina Flores in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Thursday, December 26, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 12/27 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer that: (1) The Case Management Conference currently set for 1/27/2025 vacated. (2) Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement shall be set for hearing on 3/10/2025 at 1:30 PM. (3) The parties shall brief Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement in accordance with the schedule dictated by Local Rules 6-1, 7-9, and 7-10. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
26 26 misc Status Report Mon 12/23 7:31 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. (Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/06 3:37 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer that The Case Management Conference currently set for 12/16/2024 is RESET for 1/27/2025 at 1:30 PM. (2) Not later than 12/23/2024, the Parties shall provide the Court with a further status report24 . (jp)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 12/06 1:33 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo.(Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/22 1:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer that: (1) The case schedule reflected in the 7/18/2024 Order Adopting Case Schedule (ECF20 ), including the deadline for Defendant to respond to the First Amended Complaint currently set for 11/1/2024, is continued. (2) The Case Management Conference currently set for 1/13/2025, at 11:00 AM., is reset for 12/16/2024. (3) Not later than 12/6/2024, the Parties shall provide the Court with a further status report. If the settlement agreement is finalized: (a) the Parties status report shall include a proposal for a hearing date for preliminary approval of the class settlement. (b) The 12/16/2024 Case Management Conference shall be vacated. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
22 22 misc Status Report Mon 10/21 6:24 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Following Mediation filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. (Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 07/18 5:08 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Adopting Case Schedule19 , that: The parties will file a Joint Status Report informing the Court of theresults of the 10/16/2024 mediation by 10/21/2024. Plaintiff Serves and Files FAC 10/1/2024. Plaintiff Files Class Cert. Motion 4/1/2025. The Court sets a further Case Management Conference for 1/13/2025 at 11:00 AM. See Order for specific information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
19 19 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 07/17 9:24 AM
[PROPOSED] ORDER ADOPTING CASE SCHEDULE re: Status Report18 (Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 07/15 5:10 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. (Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
17 17 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/19 10:38 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Held and Completed) before Judge Dale S. Fischer: This matter is continued to 7/22/2024 at 11:00 AM., with a Status Report due 7/15/2024. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
16 16 misc Report Mon 03/11 2:22 PM
JOINT REPORT of RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. (Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
15 15 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 08/31 1:00 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (pk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 08/30 2:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Joint Stipulation Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Case Schedule13 , that (1) All current case deadlines are vacated. (2) The Court will schedule a Case Management Conference after 2/21/2024, in order to facilitate the parties efforts in the interim to resolve the instant litigation by informal means. (See Order for specifics. (jp)
Related: [-]
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 08/30 11:07 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo Joseph DeCarlo.(Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN S. UMPIERRE IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE SCHEDULE,
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE SCHEDULE
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 06/21 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Watermark Retirement Communities, LLC, identifying Watermark Retirement Communities, LLC, Keppel Capital Senior Living, LLC, Watermark Investments Manager, LLC, and Watermark Senior Investments, LLC, Keppel Capital Senior Living, LLC, Keppel Capital US Holding, Inc., Keppel Capital Holdings Pte, LTD, Watermark Investments Manager, LLC, Watermark Senior Investments, LLC, Barnes Family Revocable Trust, Diana and David Freshwater Living Trust, David Barnes, and TFG Holdings X, LLC. (Attorney Darren K Cottriel added to party Watermark Retirement Communities, LLC(pty:dft))(Cottriel, Darren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/06 11:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. upon Watermark Retirement Communities, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Darren K. Cottriel. (Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Extension of Time to Amend Wed 05/31 3:03 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 16, 2023, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo.(Umpierre, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN S. UMPIERRE IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE SCHEDULE,
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE SCHEDULE
Thursday, March 09, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/09 9:04 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/07 10:52 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Plaintiff Watermark Retirement Communities, LLC. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/07 10:35 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/07 10:34 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/07 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/06 4:32 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo, identifying Joseph DeCarlo. (Stebner, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/06 4:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. (Stebner, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 03/06 4:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. (Stebner, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/06 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34903262 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Joseph DeCarlo. (Attorney Kathryn Ann Stebner added to party Joseph DeCarlo(pty:pla))(Stebner, Kathryn)
Related: [-]