Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah K Chasanow
Case #: 8:23-cv-00592
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2023
Terminated:Mar 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 31, 2023 7:37 AM EDT
Defendant
MGM National Harbor, LLC
Represented By
Matthew E Kreiser
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabrina Lace Plummer
3213 Duke Street, Unit 117
Arlington, VA 22314

GPO Mar 06 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/6/2024. (sat, Chambers)
GPO Mar 18 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/18/2024. (sat, Chambers)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 18, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/18 10:22 AM
ORDER GRANTING9 motion to dismiss and DISMISSING without prejudice Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/18/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
30 30 10 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 03/18 10:20 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/18/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/13 1:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sabrina Lace Plummer. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/12 4:38 PM
ORDER DENYING24 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/12/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
27 27 corresp Extension of Time - requesting Tue 03/12 2:29 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time filed by Sabrina Plummer (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/06 10:51 AM
ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to file a limited response to the motion to dismiss no later than March 13, 2024. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/6/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
25 25 10 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 03/06 10:49 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/6/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Wed 03/06 7:33 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Sabrina Lace Plummer (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Thursday, February 08, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 02/08 3:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING22 motion for extension of time and PROVIDING Plaintiff to and including March 1, 2024, to respond to9 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/8/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/07 4:36 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Legal Counsel by Sabrina Lace Plummer(ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
order Order Thu 01/04 10:42 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING20 Plaintiff's unopposed request for additional time and PROVIDING Plaintiff until February 9, 2024, to respond to9 motion to dismiss. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
20 20 corresp Extension of Time - requesting Thu 12/21 2:42 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time filed by Sabrina Lace Plummer (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/19 2:25 PM
LETTER/ORDER PROVIDING Plaintiff until December 27, 2023, to supplement her request for more time to respond with an original signature. Provided a signed supplement is received timely, Defendant is provided until January 3, 2024, to provide its position and Plaintiff is provided until January 10, 2024, to file a reply. (Attachment: Plaintiff's unsigned request for more time.) Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/19/2023. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/08 5:02 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (chs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/06 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Schneider on behalf of MGM National Harbor, LLC (Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 06/06 11:21 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MGM National Harbor, LLC identifying Other Affiliate MGM Resorts International for MGM National Harbor, LLC.(Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 order 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Tue 06/06 9:43 AM
Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/6/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 12/56 Tue 06/06 8:08 AM
Rule 12/56 notice emailed to Sabrina Lace Plummer (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 06/06 8:08 AM
QC NOTICE:10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by MGM National Harbor, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Anyone listed as having a financial interest in this litigation must be added as Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 06/06 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Sabrina Lace Plummer or counsel for Sabrina Lace Plummer are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/20/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 06/06 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. MGM National Harbor, LLC or counsel for MGM National Harbor, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/20/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
10 10 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 06/05 5:05 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MGM National Harbor, LLC (Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/05 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by MGM National Harbor, LLC(Kreiser, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memo of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/30 2:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed MGM National Harbor, LLC served on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/5/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 05/08 10:49 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to MGM National Harbor, LLC. (c/em USMS 5/8/2023 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/19 7:38 AM
ORDER granting2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order in which to complete the U.S. Marshal and summons forms and return them to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/18/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 U.S. Marshal Form
5 5 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Tue 04/18 1:57 PM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Sabrina Lace Plummer. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
4 4 misc Mail Returned Fri 04/14 9:43 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sabrina Lace Plummer Related [+]
Related: [-] -mailed on 3/31/23 ols, Deputy Clerk
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document
Monday, March 06, 2023
3 3 misc New Case Notification Letter Mon 03/06 10:26 AM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Sabrina Lace Plummer. (c/m 3/6/2023 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/06 10:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sabrina Lace Plummer (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/06 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against MGM National Harbor, LLC, filed by Sabrina Lace Plummer. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Attachment 1,
Att: 3 Attachment 2,
Att: 4 Attachment 3,
Att: 5 Attachment 4,
Att: 6 Attachment 5,
Att: 7 Envelope