Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Case #: 2:23-cv-00354
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 3:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Comenity Capital Bank N.A.
Represented By
Janeen V. Isaacson
Lipson Neilson
contact info
Joseph P Garin
Lipson Neilson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Gia Marina
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc.
Represented By
Gia Marina
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Synchrony Financial
Represented By
Brittni A. Tanenbaum
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
J Christopher Jorgensen
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilea Ellis
Represented By
Gerardo Avalos
Freedom Law Firm
contact info
George Haines
Freedom Law Firm, Llc.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Terminated: 08/18/2023
Defendant
Petal Card, Inc.
Terminated: 04/14/2023
Defendant
Citigroup Financial Products, Inc.
Terminated: 08/09/2023
Represented By
Madeleine Coles
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
First Premier Bank
Terminated: 04/05/2023
Represented By
Madeleine Coles
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
TD Bank USA, N.A.
Terminated: 08/04/2023
Represented By
Brian Melendez
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Loren S Young
Lincoln, Gustafson & Cercos
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 23, 2024
81 81 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/24 12:47 PM
ORDER Granting80 Stipulation for Dismissal of National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. re1 Complaint. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
80 80 motion Stipulation Tue 05/21 11:03 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. re1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Marilea Ellis. (Haines, George) (dismissal)
Related: [-]