Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael J Newman
Referred: Peter B Silvain, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00070
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Terminated:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 6:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Greene County, Ohio Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center
Represented By
Ashley Nicole Caldwell
Greene County Prosecutor'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Davis Kaufman
2683 Executive Dr.
Troy, OH 45373
Represented By
Matthew G Bruce
contact info
Evan Ryan McFarland
Spitz, The Employee'S Law Firm
contact info
Evan R McFarland
Spitz Law Firm LLC
contact info

GPO Nov 09 2023
(pb)ORDER: (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 13); AND (2) DENYING AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 12). Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 11/9/23.

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/21 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman (Long, Samuel)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/21 3:14 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. Per32 . (srb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
31 31 misc Status Report Wed 01/22 10:24 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Defendant Board of Greene County Commissioners. (Hushion, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
order Order Tue 01/14 2:13 PM
NOTATION ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of discovery and the parties' position on mediation on or before 1/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 1/14/2025. (lk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
30 30 misc Status Report Mon 12/30 1:47 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Defendant Board of Greene County Commissioners. (Hushion, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/06 9:47 AM
Set Deadline: Joint Status Report due on or before 12/30/2024. (srb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
minutes Discovery Conference Tue 11/26 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr.: Discovery Teleconference held on 11/26/2024 before Magistrate Judge Silvain. The parties were instructed to file a joint status report on or before 12/30/2024. The parties indicated that they may need additional time to complete discovery and were instructed to file a joint motion to extend the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines. (lk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Tots Olayvar Long for Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman (Long, Samuel)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/19 2:04 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting28 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order is amended as follows: Discovery due by 12/3/2024. Dispositive motions due by 12/31/2024. The discovery teleconference scheduled for 9/26/2024 at 10:30 AM is hereby RESET to 11/26/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. TELECONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS: Please call 1-669-216-1590. The Meeting ID is 160 050 0098. The passcode is 488395. If you have any questions, please call Chambers at 937-512-1620. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 9/19/2024. (lk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/18 12:19 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 12/3/2024. by Defendant Board of Greene County Commissioners. (Hushion, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
order Order setting Telephone Conference Tue 09/03 9:13 AM
NOTATION ORDER: Discovery Status Teleconference set for 9/26/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. TELECONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS: Please call 1-669-216-1590. The Meeting ID is 160 050 0098. The passcode is 488395. If you have any questions, please call Chambers at 937-512-1620. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 9/3/2024. (sjl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 08/09 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Michael Kent Hushion substituting for Evan M. Schantz as to Defendant Board of Greene County Commissioners. (Hushion, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 06/20 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Evan Michael Schantz substituting for Mac P. Malone as to Defendant Board of Greene County Commissioners. (Schantz, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
25 25 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 01/17 3:37 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Dayton Preliminary Pretrial Order Wed 01/17 12:11 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Motions directed to pleadings due by 2/23/2024. Motions to Amend due by 2/2/2024. Lay Witness due by 3/1/2024. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 4/5/2024. Defendant Primary Expert due by 5/3/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/7/2024. Discovery due by 10/4/2024. Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2024. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/16/24. (pb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
23 23 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 01/12 3:18 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/11 11:07 AM
ORDER: (1) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER; (2) ORDERING THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) REPORT ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 19, 2024; AND (3) ORDERING THE PARTIES TO MAKE INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 12/11/23. (pb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 10, 2023
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Sun 12/10 6:09 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint filed by Board of Greene County Commissioners. (Malone, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
20 20 misc Stipulation Mon 11/13 3:02 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Board of Greene County Commissioners. (Malone, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/09 1:11 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Board of Greene County Commissioners, filed by Shannon Davis Kaufman. (pb)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 11/09 1:02 PM
ORDER: (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO.13 ); AND (2) DENYING AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO.12 ). Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 11/9/23. (pb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
17 17 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/05 11:14 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,13 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Notice of Non-Opposition) filed by Defendant Greene County, Ohio Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center. (Malone, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/05 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mackenzie Patrick Malone for Defendant Greene County, Ohio Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center (Malone, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/05 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by D Patrick Kasson for Defendant Greene County, Ohio Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center (Kasson, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/16 9:57 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman. (McFarland, Evan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Wed 08/16 9:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman. (McFarland, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/26 10:44 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Greene County, Ohio Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center. (Caldwell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Wed 07/26 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Evan Ryan McFarland substituting for Matthew G. Bruce as to Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman. (McFarland, Evan)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/26 7:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Nicole Caldwell for Defendant Greene County, Ohio Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center (Caldwell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/17 4:27 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman re7 Order to Show Cause, (McFarland, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
order Order Mon 07/17 5:05 PM
NOTATION ORDER: In light of9 Plaintiff's Notice, the Court finds that Plaintiff has satisfied this Court's7 Show Cause Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. s/ Hon. Michael J. Newman on 7/17/2023. (bjs)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/14 4:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Greene County, Ohio Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center on 6/14/2023, answer due 8/14/2023. (McFarland, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
7 7 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 07/05 10:29 AM
ORDER: (1) REJECTING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THE SHOW CAUSE ORDER (Doc. No.5 ); (2) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE; AND (3) REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT PROOF, ON OR BEFORE JULY 17, 2023, THAT SHE EITHER EFFECTIVELY SERVED DEFENDANT UNDER S.D. OHIO CIV. R. 4.2 OR ATTEMPTED TO EFFECT SERVICE, AND DEFENDANT REFUSED SERVICE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/30/23. (pb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/29 9:44 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman (Bruce, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/28 5:13 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Shannon Davis Kaufman RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Bruce, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 06/15 8:47 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing and on or before June 28, 2023, as to why the complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) for failure to timely serve the Center. Plaintiff may satisfy the Court's show cause requirement by either (1) filing appropriate evidence showing that the Center was properly served within the time period permitted by Rule 4(m) or (2) accomplishing, and evidencing on the Courts docket, service of process occurred on or before June 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/14/2023. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/13 3:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greene County, Ohio Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center, filed by Shannon Davis Kaufman. (Bruce, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/09 2:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center. (srb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/07 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Miami Valley Juvenile Rehabilitation Center ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9306458), filed by Shannon Davis Kaufman. (Bruce, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form