Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:William I Arbuckle
Case #: 4:23-cv-00409
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Jan 31 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/31/2025. (caw)
GPO Jan 31 2025
ORDER - In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion 20, it is ORDERED that: (1) The final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (2) Final judgment will be issued pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in favor of the Commissioner by separate order. (3) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/31/2025. (caw)

Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
22 22 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 01/31 2:58 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Acting Commissioner of Social Security and against Plaintiff. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/31/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Verbal Motion SSA Consent Fri 01/31 2:52 PM
ORDER - In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion20 , it is ORDERED that: (1) The final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (2) Final judgment will be issued pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in favor of the Commissioner by separate order. (3) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/31/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
20 20 19 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Fri 01/31 2:49 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/31/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
19 19 respm Brief (Reply Brief in Response to Deft's Brief) Filed By Plaintiff in Social Security Appeal Case Fri 10/06 10:18 PM
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF by Amber Bess Folk as to18 Brief Filed By Defendant in Social Security Appeal Case,16 Brief Filed By Plaintiff in Social Security Appeal Case. (Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
18 18 respm Brief Filed By Defendant in Social Security Appeal Case Fri 09/22 6:30 AM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Acting Commissioner of Social Security.(Weiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Word Count
17 17 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 09/22 6:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Weiss on behalf of Acting Commissioner of Social Security (Weiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
16 16 respm Brief Filed By Plaintiff in Social Security Appeal Case Thu 08/31 10:50 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Amber Bess Folk. Defendant Brief due by 10/2/2023. (Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time in Social Security Case to File Brief Wed 07/26 2:09 PM
ORDER granting14 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Social Security Case to File a Brief. Plaintiff's Brief is now due on or before 8/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 7/26/2023. (caw)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Brief in SSA Case Wed 07/26 11:35 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time in Social Security Case to File Plaintiff Brief by Amber Bess Folk.(Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Concurrence,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time in Social Security Case to File Brief Tue 05/30 10:45 AM
ORDER granting12 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief. Plaintiff's Brief is now due on or before 8/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 5/30/2023. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Brief in SSA Case Fri 05/26 2:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Social Security Case to File Plaintiff Brief by Amber Bess Folk.(Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Concurrence,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
11 11 misc Transcript (Social Security Case) Wed 05/03 2:32 PM
Transcript from the Social Security Administration of entire record of proceedings.(Swauger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 6 Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 3
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/03 2:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff Brief due by 6/2/2023.(Swauger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
9 9 misc Consents to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate Judge in Direct Assignment Cases Mon 03/13 1:16 PM
CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Arbuckle in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2022-19. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
8 8 order Special Admissions Form Approved Fri 03/10 3:35 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Edward A. Wicklund. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 3/10/2023. (caw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 03/10 3:23 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Parente is directed to have Attorney Wicklund request e-filing privileges through Pacer.uscourts.gov (all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption). (nr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
7 7 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Thu 03/09 3:22 PM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/10/2023. (caw)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 03/09 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Swauger on behalf of Acting Commissioner of Social Security. (Swauger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
5 5 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/08 2:04 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrea Parente on behalf of Amber Bess Folk Attorney Edward A. Wicklund is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6221750.. (Parente, Andrea)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Standing Order 2022-26 in Social Security Appeals Wed 03/08 9:29 AM
STANDING ORDER 2022-26 in Social Security Appeals.(nr)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/08 9:27 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; Complaint is now deemed filed. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to notify the Acting Commissioner of Social Security of the commencement of this action by transmitting a Notice of Electronic Filing to theappropriate office within the Social Security Administrations Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 3/8/2023 (nr)
Related: [-]
service Service Made Electronically-SSA Cases Wed 03/08 9:28 AM
Service Made Electronically - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g), and the Court's Standing Order 2022-26, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Court's CM/ECF system notifying the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney for the Middle District of Pennsylvania of the commencement of this action. No summons shall issue. (nr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/07 3:35 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amber Bess Folk.(ea)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/07 3:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Acting Commissioner of Social Security lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Amber Bess Folk.(ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action