Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Mark A Beatty
Case #: 3:23-cv-00802
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 4:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Friendship Manor Group, LLC
485 South Friendship Drive
Nashville, IL 62263
Represented By
Brian M. O'Neal
Mcmahon, Berger, Pc - St. Louis
contact info
Mediator
Mediator Frank Neuner
Neuner Mediation & Dispute Resolution 120 South Central Ave. Suite 1250
St. Louis, MO 63105
Plaintiff
Jane Jablonski
161 P.O. Box
Nashville, IL 62263
Represented By
Ferne P. Wolf
Sowers & Wolf, LLC
contact info
Jill A. Silverstein
Sowers & Wolf, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
31 31 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 01/16 3:08 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/16/2024. (scm)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/16 3:05 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The parties filed29 Stipulation of Dismissal, indicating this case should be dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), a stipulation of dismissal is effective immediately upon filing and does not require judicial approval. See e.g., Jenkins v. Village of Maywood, 506 F.3d 622, 624 (7th Cir. 2007). Accordingly, pursuant to the parties' stipulation, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/16/2024. (scm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/12 11:52 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jane Jablonski. (Wolf, Ferne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
28 28 order Order 60 Day Wed 11/29 2:57 PM
60 DAY ORDER: The undersigned has been advised by the mediator that this action has settled in its entirety but additional time is needed to consummate the settlement (Doc. 27). In light of the settlement, the Court DENIES AS MOOT all pending motions, CANCELS all settings, and VACATES all deadlines and hearings in this case. Additionally, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED, 60 days after entry of this Order, to ENTER JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, unless otherwise provided in the settlement documents. If the parties fail to finalize the settlement within the 60-day period, they may -- before that period expires on January 29, 2024 -- move to postpone entry of judgment to a later date.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/29/2023. (scm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
27 27 misc Report of Mandatory Mediation Tue 11/28 1:07 PM
REPORT of Mandatory Mediation by Mediator Frank Neuner. Case has settled. (mta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
26 26 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 11/14 3:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING in part24 Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order. The parties submitted a proposed agreed confidentiality order to the undersigned's proposed documents inbox in response to the Court's order (Doc. 25). The undersigned has approved the confidentiality order, with certain additions to paragraph 7, which detail how the parties shall seek Court approval prior to filing any documents covered by the confidentiality order on the docket. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/14/2023. (scm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
25 25 order Order Mon 11/13 1:31 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order (Doc. 24) and the proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order (Doc. 24-1). While the Court intends to grant the joint motion, the Court requires the proposed confidentiality order (which is currently attached as PDF exhibit to the motion) be submitted to the undersigned's proposed documents inbox in a format compatible with Microsoft Word so the Court can format and modify the order as necessary. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to submit their proposed confidentiality order to the undersigned's proposed documents inbox (MABpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/13/2023. (scm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
24 24 motion For Order Fri 11/10 2:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Order to Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order by Friendship Manor Group, LLC.(O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, September 21, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 09/21 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/4/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty via ZOOM. The parties will receive a ZOOM invitation via email from the Court.(jmj)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Status Conference Thu 09/21 1:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Status Conference held on 9/21/2023. Attorney Ferne Wolf appears on behalf of the Plaintiff. Attorney Brian O'Neal appears on behalf of the Defendant. Parties have exchanged written discovery. Status conference to be set by separate notice to follow up on the status of discovery. (Court Reporter Liberty Recording.) (jmj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 06/28 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty via ZOOM. The parties will receive a ZOOM invitation via email from the Court. (jmj)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 06/28 1:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/22/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2024. Stipulation Selecting Mediator to be filed by 8/3/2023. Mandatory Mediation Session to be completed by 1/23/2024. Mandatory Mediation Program Completion due by 3/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 6/28/2023. (jmj)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order Wed 06/28 1:14 PM
ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the Joint Report of Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order. As the proposed dates conform with the Local Rules established for the Southern District of Illinois district court, the Report is accepted and will be filed as the operative Scheduling Order on the Court's docket. The Scheduling Conference set for July 6, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby CANCELLED. The parties are DIRECTED to consult the undersigned's case management procedures for any questions about the undersigned's case protocols. This case will be set for a ZOOM status conference in 60-90 days to check in with the parties on the progress of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 6/28/2023. (jmj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
18 18 misc Stipulation Selecting Mediator Wed 06/14 3:36 PM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Mediator Frank Neuner has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. Signed by Brian M. O'Neal on behalf, and with consent, of all Counsel of Record on 6/14/2023. (O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 05/25 1:02 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/25/2023. (jmj)
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/25 12:59 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty via ZOOM. The parties will receive a ZOOM invitation via email from the Court. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/25/2023. (jmj)
Related: [-]
15 15 order CJRA Track Thu 05/25 12:49 PM
CJRA TRACK B assigned: Presumptive Jury Trial month set for July 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/25/2023. (jmj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
14 14 notice Notice Upon Consent to Trial by Magistrate Thu 05/18 2:23 PM
NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 23-802-MAB. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (lmb)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/18 10:39 AM
FINAL CONSENT TO TRIAL BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (O'Neal, Brian) Modified/unsealed on 5/18/2023 (lmb)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Requesting Consent Thu 05/18 10:08 AM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Friendship Manor Group, LLC to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 347, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Friendship Manor Group, LLC on 5/18/2023. Consent due by 6/8/2023 (lmb)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 05/18 9:17 AM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Friendship Manor Group, LLC. (O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/18 9:11 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Friendship Manor Group, LLC.(O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/18 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. O'Neal on behalf of Friendship Manor Group, LLC (O'Neal, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/08 11:16 AM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wolf, Ferne)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 03/08 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Friendship Manor Group, LLC. Original summons mailed to Attorney Wolf. (lmb)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment Wed 03/08 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Orders 257 and 341. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 257 and 341, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Jane Jablonski. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 23-802-MAB. Consent due by 3/29/2023 (lmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
5 5 service Summons Requested Tue 03/07 5:01 PM
Summons Requested. (Wolf, Ferne)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Jury Demand Tue 03/07 4:50 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jane Jablonski. (Wolf, Ferne)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/07 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jill A. Silverstein on behalf of Jane Jablonski (Silverstein, Jill)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/07 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ferne P. Wolf on behalf of Jane Jablonski (Wolf, Ferne)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/07 4:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Friendship Manor Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5019949.), filed by Jane Jablonski.(Wolf, Ferne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet