Arizona District Court
Judge:Stephen M Mcnamee
Case #: 3:23-cv-08046
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Case in other court:Yavapai County Superior Court, S1300CV202300082
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 3:09 AM MST
Defendant
Secura Insurance Company
Represented By
Kathleen Kassmann
Moulton Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Jones
Represented By
Jason Aldridge
Zinda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Ariana Leigh Byrd
Zinda Law Group PLLC
contact info
Ariana Byrd
Zinda Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, September 13, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/13 9:35 AM
ORDER approving the Stipulation (Doc.28 ) and dismissing this action in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/13/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
29 29 misc Report - Status Thu 09/12 4:06 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Secura Insurance Company. (Kassmann, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/12 1:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Secura Insurance Company.(Kassmann, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order of Dismissal
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 09/11 9:47 AM
ORDER that the parties must file a joint status report on or before September 25, 2024 as to the status of arbitration of this action. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/11/2024. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
26 26 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Clear Flags 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Wed 06/14 1:57 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee: Scheduling Conference held on 6/14/2023. The Court notes that in the parties' Joint 26(f) Proposed Case Management Report (Doc.24 ) requests a stay of this case pending arbitration of the UIM claim. Discussion held. Based on the parties' stipulation, IT IS ORDERED staying this case pending completion of arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing counsel to file a joint status report within 15 days after the arbitrator's ruling advising the Court regarding the status of the case. APPEARANCES: Ariana Byrd for Plaintiff. Plaintiff Andrew Jones is present telephonically. Kathleen Kassmann for Defendant. Defense representative Kevin Hoskins is present telephonically. (Court Reporter Scott Coniam) Hearing held 10:59 AM to 11:10 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only) Wed 06/07 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Ariana Byrd. (Byrd, Ariana)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Wed 06/07 4:09 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Andrew Jones. (Byrd, Ariana)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney) Wed 06/07 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Ariana Byrd. (Byrd, Ariana)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
22 22 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/23 9:22 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jason Aldridge. Reason for return: Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable to Forward. Document number21 . (WLP)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 05/15 1:54 PM
ORDER granting the Joint Motion Permitting Parties to Appear Telephonically. (Doc.20 ). Plaintiff Andrew Jones and Defendant's representative, Kevin Hoskins, may appear telephonically. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel will receive dial-in instructions for the teleconference separately via electronic mail. However, only those that have been granted permission to appear telephonically may do so. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/15/2023. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Mon 05/15 9:50 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference by Secura Insurance Company.(Kassmann, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 21, 2023
19 19 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/25 11:53 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jason Aldridge. Reason for return: Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable to Forward. Document number15 . (WLP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
18 18 misc Mail Returned Mon 04/24 10:28 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ariana Leigh Byrd. Reason for return: Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known. Document number11 ,12 . (WLP)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Mail Returned Fri 04/21 4:02 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jason Aldridge. Reason for return: Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known. Document number12 ,11 ]. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
16 16 misc Mail Returned Thu 04/20 9:58 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ariana Leigh Byrd. Reason for return: Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable to Forward. Document number15 . Note: attorney is now registered for efiling. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 04/07 2:32 PM
ORDER granting the14 Motion to Continue and resetting the Rule 16 Prelminary Pretrial Conference for 6/14/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/7/2023. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
14 14 motion Continue Wed 04/05 1:24 PM
MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Secura Insurance Company.(Kassmann, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 03, 2023
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/03 10:41 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Secura Insurance Company. (Kassmann, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
12 12 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/31 2:27 PM
ORDER setting a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 5/31/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/31/2023. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/31 2:19 PM
SECOND NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Secura Insurance Company. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/27 4:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Secura Insurance Company.(Kassmann, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
9 9 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/20 9:03 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jason Aldridge. Reason for return: Return to Sender: Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward. Document number2 . (REK)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/20 9:02 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ariana Leigh Byrd. Reason for return: Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable to Forward. Document number2 . (WLP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
7 7 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Fri 03/10 11:54 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Secura Insurance Company. (Kassmann, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
6 6 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Wed 03/08 11:33 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Secura Insurance Company. (Kassmann, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/07 3:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Secura Insurance Company. (SCA)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Tue 03/07 3:53 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Secura Insurance Company. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Tue 03/07 3:52 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Secura Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Tue 03/07 3:52 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21665565. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-08046 PCT-SMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/07 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Yavapai County Superior Court, case number S1300CV202300082. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21665565 filed by Secura Insurance Company. (Kassmann, Kathleen)(SCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit