Emery v. Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00360 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 3:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bill Travis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mia Emery
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Tue 03/19 9:40 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (GA) |
|
43 | 43
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order
Tue 03/19 9:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No.41 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/19/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/19/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 03/18 5:45 PM
ANSWER to39 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Travis Bill, Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC.(Llewellyn, Brittany) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Stipulation
Fri 03/15 11:51 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Defendants Travis Bill, Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC. (Llewellyn, Brittany) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice Other
Thu 03/14 12:23 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Notice to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum to Aetna, Alignment Health Plan, Humana and Maverick by Mia Emery..(Burris, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
cmp
Complaint Amended
Mon 03/04 11:28 AM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mia Emery. No changes to parties. (Burris, Steven) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 02/26 10:14 AM
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to amend (ECF No.32 ) is granted in part and denied in part . It is granted regarding Plaintiff's request to amend her complaint. It is denied regarding Plaintiff's proposed amendment attached to that motion. Plaintiff shall file and serve her revised proposed amendment attached to her reply (ECF No.36 -1) as required by Local Rule 15-1(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/23/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Tue 12/19 1:36 PM
ORDER denying ECF No.13 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/19/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Thursday, November 23, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Reply
Thu 11/23 1:33 PM
REPLY to Response to32 Motion to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Mia Emery.(Burris, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Revised Proposed Third Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Reply
Fri 11/17 2:31 PM
RESPONSE REPLY to32 Motion to Amend/Correct by Defendant Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC. (Llewellyn, Brittany) Modified event type and text on 11/17/2023 (EDS) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 11/15 10:30 AM
ORDER granting33 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/5/2024. Motions due by 5/6/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Stipulation
Mon 11/13 11:02 AM
Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re: DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Defendant Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC. (Llewellyn, Brittany) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Motion Amend/Correct
Fri 11/03 3:20 PM
MOTION to Amend30 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Mia Emery. Responses due by 11/17/2023.(Burris, Steven) (pleading) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proosed Third Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/29 1:31 PM
ANSWER to30 Amended Complaint SECOND AMENDED filed by All Defendants.(Llewellyn, Brittany) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
cmp
Complaint Amended
Mon 09/18 1:51 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mia Emery. Adds and removes parties. (Burris, Steven) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
8
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 09/18 1:04 PM
ORDER Granting28 Stipulation to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/15/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Stipulation
Thu 09/14 6:23 PM
STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Mia Emery. (Burris, Steven) (other) (pleading) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order
Wed 08/30 9:27 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.26 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 2/2/2024 . Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2024 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/4/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation
Mon 08/28 11:19 AM
Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendants Bill Travis, Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC. (Llewellyn, Brittany) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Stipulation
Wed 08/16 3:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/16/2023. Re:24 Stipulation to extend discovery deadlines. Having reviewed the parties' stipulation, the Court finds that it fails to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 because it does not provide good cause for the extension and fails to comply with Local Rule 26-3 because it does not include the items required by that Local Rule. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stipulation24 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TG) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stipulation
Tue 08/15 2:55 PM
Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Joint Stipulation by Plaintiff Mia Emery. (Burris, Steven) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 06/21 12:51 PM
ORDER Granting22 Stipulation Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/21/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stipulation
Mon 06/19 4:18 PM
STIPULATION Confidentiality and Protective Order by Defendants Bill Travis, Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC. (Llewellyn, Brittany) (other) (protective) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice Other
Tue 06/06 9:31 AM
NOTICE by Bill Travis, Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC.. (Smith, Phillip) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Fri 04/28 9:56 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ALZ) |
||
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
9
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Fri 04/28 9:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/4/2023. Motions due by 1/3/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Reply
Thu 04/27 3:30 PM
REPLY to Response to13 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Plaintiff Mia Emery.(Burris, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Wed 04/26 11:37 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mia Emery.. (Burris, Steven) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response
Thu 04/20 2:41 PM
RESPONSE to13 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendants Bill Travis, Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC. Replies due by 4/27/2023. (Russell, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice Other
Tue 04/11 6:01 PM
NOTICE Amended Notice of Telephonic F.R.C.P. 26 Conference (Time Change Only) by Mia Emery.. (Burris, Steven) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/06 4:30 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Mia Emery.. (Burris, Steven) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Motion Remand to State Court
Thu 04/06 4:11 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court re1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Mia Emery. Responses due by 4/20/2023.(Burris, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/03 4:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Travis Bill's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Bill Travis.(Russell, Howard) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Thu 03/23 3:27 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC.. (Russell, Howard) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 03/20 4:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mia Emery re7 Summons Issued. Bill Travis served on 3/20/2023. (Burris, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Wed 03/15 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Telephonic F.R.C.P. 26 Conference by Mia Emery.. (Burris, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/14 4:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/24/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/28/2023.(Russell, Howard) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/13 6:17 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bill Travis re1 Petition for Removal. (KF) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Fri 03/10 10:29 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Defendant Bill Travis by Plaintiff Mia Emery. (Burris, Steven) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 03/09 4:09 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Mia Emery. (Burris, Steven) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 4:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mia Emery. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Burris, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Wed 03/08 8:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/8/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/23/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 03/07 4:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy Inc for Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC added.. (Russell, Howard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Tue 03/07 4:05 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-23-863341-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7228399) by Warm Springs Road CVS, LLC. Proof of service due by 4/3/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2023. (Russell, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 03/08 8:17 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF) |