California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-00405
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02022-01291528
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 3:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Piedmont Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Kelly S Wood
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Mark W Robertson
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Michelle Lujano
Represented By
William Lucas Marder
Polaris Law Group LLP
contact info
Larry W Lee
Diversity Law Group PC
contact info
Edward W Choi
Choi And Associates Apc
contact info
Dennis S Hyun
Hyun Legal Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
43 43 judgmentCV Judgment Wed 06/12 2:20 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court enters Final Judgment as follows: (1) Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. (2) Plaintiff shall take nothing on her claims against Defendant. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
42 42 notice Notice of Lodging Fri 05/24 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] FINAL JUDGMENT re Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,41(Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Proposed Final Judgment
Thursday, May 16, 2024
41 41 order Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 05/16 5:04 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS32 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The court GRANTS the Motion as to all of Plaintiff's claims. When ruling on a Rule 12(c) motion, "leave to amend should be granted even if no request is made unless amendment would be futile." Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant are DISMISSED without leave to amend. The court also ORDERS Defendant to lodge a proposed judgment consistent with this Order within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall then file any objections to the proposed judgment within ten (10) days of Defendant filing the proposed judgment. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
40 40 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/22 4:19 PM
ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Deadlines39 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter the court ORDERS the court's 10/20/2023, Joint Stipulation to Continue Class Certification Deadlines31 MODIFIED to read as follows (with changes indicated by italics): Bench Trial set for 6/17/2025 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 5/15/2025 at 8:30 AM. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 10/1/2024. Last Date to Hear Motions: 2/20/2025. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 4/3/2025. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 10/14/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 4/10/2025. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
39 39 stip Continue Wed 03/20 2:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Case Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano.(Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE DEADLINES
Monday, January 29, 2024
38 38 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 01/29 10:23 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court is Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings32 . The court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for February 1, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
37 37 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 01/18 6:38 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 32 filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. (Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
36 36 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/11 2:41 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 32 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
35 35 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Thu 12/07 9:19 AM
ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings34 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the following: The hearing on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, currently set on 1/18/2024, at 10:00 AM 33 , is continued to 2/1/2024 at 10:00 AM. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
34 34 stip Continue Tue 12/05 5:04 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date from 01/18/2024 to 02/01/2024 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 32 filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc..(Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kelly S. Wood in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date on Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date on Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
33 33 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 11/21 11:33 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings32 currently set for December 21, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. to January 18, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.Counsel is reminded to refer to the list of CLOSED motion dates on Judge Slaughters Procedures and Schedules page prior to filing future motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
32 32 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 11/17 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(C),
Att: 2 Declaration of Kelly S. Wood in Support of Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 11 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Friday, October 20, 2023
31 31 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/20 2:20 PM
ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Deadlines30 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter the court ORDERS the court's 7/3/2023, Joint Stipulation to Continue Class Certification Deadlines28 MODIFIED to read as follows (withchanges indicated by italics): Bench Trial set for 1/14/2025 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 12/12/2024 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 4/11/2024. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 4/1/2024. Last Date to Hear Motions: 9/5/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 9/23/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 10/14/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 10/28/2024. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
30 30 stip Continue Mon 10/16 11:04 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Case Deadlines filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc..(Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kelly Wood in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Deadlines,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
29 29 order Remand Case to State Court Leave to File Document Thu 09/07 5:44 PM
MINUTES ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and DENYING Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply13 21 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court finds the Motion to Remand is timely and the amount in controversy exceeds the $5 million jurisdictional threshold, the Motion to Remand is DENIED. For the reasons set forth above, the Motion to Remand and Motion for Leave are both DENIED. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
28 28 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/03 5:06 PM
ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Class Certification Deadlines27 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter the court ORDERS the court's 4/21/2023, Scheduling Order17 MODIFIED to read as follows (with changes indicated by italics): Jury Trial set for 10/1/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 8/22/2024 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 2/29/2024. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 11/2/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 6/6/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 6/20/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 7/18/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 7/25/2024. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
27 27 stip Continue Tue 06/27 3:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Class Certification Deadlines filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc..(Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kelly S. Wood in Support of Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Joint Stipulation to Continue Class Certification Deadlines,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Class Certification Deadlines
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
26 26 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/13 9:09 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court is Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand21 . The court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for June 15, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/12 4:59 PM
Notice Of Request and Request to Take Off Calendar the hearing on Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc..(Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Taking Off Calendar the hearing On Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion or Remand
Thursday, May 18, 2023
24 24 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 05/18 3:58 PM
MINUTES OF Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court13 held before Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Motion hearing held. The Court hears oral argument from the parties. The Court takes the Motion under submission. Order to issue. Court Reporter: CourtSmart. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Edward Choi; Attorneys for Defendant: Kelly Wood. Courtroom Deputy: Melissa H. Kunig; Time in Court: 0:16. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
23 23 notice Change of Lead Counsel Wed 05/17 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Mark Robertson to Kelly S. Wood. filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc., (Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
22 22 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/15 3:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand 21 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
21 21 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/12 7:13 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplemental Declaration of James Jackson,
Att: 2 Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
20 20 respm Reply (Motion related) Tue 05/02 10:26 AM
REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court13 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/27 6:13 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court13 filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc..(Robertson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of James Jackson in Support of Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to California Superior Court
Monday, April 24, 2023
18 18 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 04/24 1:42 PM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/21 11:27 AM
MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2023, and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 5/21/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 5/2/2024 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 2/29/2024. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 11/2/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 2/8/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 2/22/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 4/11/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 4/18/2024. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
16 16 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 04/20 7:16 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 Days, filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc...(Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
Thursday, April 06, 2023
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/06 10:13 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano, (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
14 14 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 04/05 4:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano13 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) no notice of interested parties. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
13 13 motion Remand Case to State Court Tue 04/04 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND
Monday, March 13, 2023
12 12 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 03/13 11:30 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2023 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/13 9:16 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
10 10 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Thu 03/09 10:47 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00405-FWS(DFMx). (dta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 03/08 8:30 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on 3/8/2023. (Robertson, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/08 3:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/08 3:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/08 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 03/07 4:32 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelly S Wood counsel for Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. Adding Kelly S. Wood as counsel of record for Piedmont Airlines, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. (Attorney Kelly S Wood added to party Piedmont Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wood, Kelly)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/07 4:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc. identifying American Airlines Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Robertson, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/07 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc., identifying Michelle Lujano, Larry W. Lee, Esq., William L. Barder, Esq., Dennis S. Hyun, Esq., Edward W. Choi, Esq., Piedmont Airlines, Inc., and American Airlines, Group, Inc.. (Robertson, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/07 4:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. (Robertson, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/07 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022 01291528-CU-OE-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-34912938 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. (Attorney Mark W Robertson added to party Piedmont Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Robertson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Declaration of James Jackson in Support of Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.'s Notice of Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 03/08 3:38 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Piedmont Airlines, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano.[FILED IN STATE COURT 11/14/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/08 3:42 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano, upon Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc. served on 11/17/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/02/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 03/08 3:44 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to CLASS ACTION Complaint filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 01/06/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/08 3:47 PM
NONCONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Piedmont Airlines, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Michelle Lujano [STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 03/08 3:49 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to FIRST Amended CLASS ACTION Complaint, filed by Defendant Piedmont Airlines, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 02/27/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 9 EXHIBIT I TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]