Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Case #: 2:23-cv-00361
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-23-864661-C
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 2:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Yvonne Richardson
Represented By
Bruce Scott Dickinson
Thorndal Armstrong, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Idalmis Escobar-Leon
Represented By
Kristian William Lavigne
Law Office Of Kristian Lavigne
contact info
Jeffrey James Lavigne
The Law Offices Of Kristian Lavigne And Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Jeanjaques-Maurisset
Represented By
Kristian William Lavigne
Law Office Of Kristian Lavigne
contact info
Jeffrey James Lavigne
The Law Offices Of Kristian Lavigne And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Wed 01/10 3:37 PM
ORDER granting21 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
21 21 motion Stipulation Mon 01/08 9:49 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRJUDICE by Defendant Yvonne Richardson. (Dickinson, Bruce) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
notice MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Mon 01/08 11:29 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-00361-APG-MDC . (no image attached) (LG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
20 20 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Wed 11/01 9:38 AM
ORDER Granting19 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 4/8/2024. Motions due by 5/8/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
19 19 motion Stipulation Mon 10/30 2:01 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) by Defendant Yvonne Richardson. (Dickinson, Bruce) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/06 3:23 PM
ORDER Granting16 Stipulation Regarding FRCP 35 Examination of Luis Jeanjaques-Maurisset. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
17 17 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/06 3:17 PM
ORDER Granting15 Stipulation Regarding FRCP 35 Examination of Idalmis Escobar-Leon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/6/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Stipulation Fri 10/06 10:42 AM
STIPULATION Regarding FRCP 35 Examination of Luis Jeanjaques-Maurisset by Plaintiff Luis Jeanjaques-Maurisset. (Lavigne, Kristian) (other) (discovery)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulation Fri 10/06 10:40 AM
STIPULATION Regarding FRCP 35 Examination of Idalmis Escobar-Leon by Plaintiff Idalmis Escobar-Leon. (Lavigne, Kristian) (other) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
14 14 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Thu 08/17 4:37 PM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 1/8/2024. Motions due by 2/6/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
13 13 motion Stipulation Wed 08/16 12:07 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re11 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Defendant Yvonne Richardson. (Dickinson, Bruce) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
11 11 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 04/24 10:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/8/2023. Motions due by 12/8/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/24/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Mon 04/24 10:50 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
10 10 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 04/21 2:19 PM
Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Yvonne Richardson.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 04/03 2:02 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Yvonne Richardson.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
8 8 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 03/16 2:14 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Yvonne Richardson.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Wed 03/08 3:50 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand re1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Yvonne Richardson. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/18/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/22/2023.(Dickinson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 03/08 11:11 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Luis Jeanjaques-Maurisset that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Lavigne, Kristian)
Related: [-]
5 5 minord Minute Order Removal Case Wed 03/08 8:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/8/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/23/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 03/08 8:56 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Wed 03/08 8:57 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 03/07 4:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by YVONNE RICHARDSON, that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Dickinson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/07 4:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET to1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant YVONNE RICHARDSON,. (Dickinson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Tue 03/07 4:48 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-864661-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7228576) by YVONNE RICHARDSON,. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2023. (Dickinson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 3 Errata Answer, IAFD & DMJT