Bond et al v. Lobel Financial et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00356 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Lobel Financial
|
|
Defendant
AhKhein Mattews
|
|
Plaintiff
Nia Bond
4505 South Maryland Parkway
Las Vegas, NV 89154 |
|
Plaintiff
Angela Zimerman
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 01/22 1:48 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re8 Order addressed to Nia Bond. Envelope marked Return to Sender; No new address. (JQC) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 10/24 3:01 PM
Order Adopting Report & Recommendation and Dismissing Action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the magistrate judge's report and recommendation (ECF No.7 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE . Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 10/05 9:17 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's case be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 10/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 08/23 2:49 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re5 Order, addressed to Nia Bond. Envelope marked: Return to Sender; No new address. (JQC) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 06/12 11:59 AM
ORDER regarding4 Plaintiff's mail returned not deliverable. Plaintiff must update her address by July 10, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF. Copy of Order mailed 6/12/2023 to Plaintiff to the address listed on page 2 of Order. - AF) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 06/08 12:01 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3 Order addressed to Nia Bond. Envelope marked: Return to Sender; No new address. (JQC) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 05/26 3:04 PM
ORDER Denying without prejudice1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff has until 6/26/2023 to file an updated application to proceed in forma pauperis using the Long Form as specified in this order or pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/26/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Att: 1 IFP/Instructions | ||
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Tue 03/07 3:27 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/07 3:25 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiffs Nia Bond, Angela Zimerman.(JQC) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Application for Protection |