Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:23-cv-00087
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2023
Re-opened:Nov 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 04, 2023 2:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Pershing County
Defendant
Pershing County Sheriffs
Defendant
Bryce Shields
Defendant
Karen Stephens
Defendant
Shawn Howard Thornhill
Plaintiff
Keon Williams
PO Box 224
Lovelock, NV 89419


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, December 26, 2024
14 14 misc Mail Returned Tue 12/31 9:31 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 13 Minute Order, addressed to Keon Williams. (GA)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
13 13 minord Minute Order Fri 12/13 4:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 12/13/2024. On November 22, the Court notified Plaintiff that if they did not update their address by December 13, this case would be subject to dismissal under Local Rules IA 11-8 and IA 3-1. (ECF No. 11.) Plaintiff has not updated their address by the set deadline. It is therefore ordered that the Magistrate Judge's Report & Recommendation (ECF No. 5 ), recommending dismissal without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to update their address is ADOPTED. It is further ordered that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Local Rules IA 11-8 and IA 3-1. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case accordingly. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
12 12 misc Mail Returned Mon 12/09 12:48 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 11 Minute Order, addressed to Keon Williams. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 minord Minute Order Fri 11/22 4:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 11/22/2024. The Clerk of Court is instructed to reopen this case and strike the Courts prior orders regarding Plaintiffs failure to provide the Court with an updated address (ECF No. 7, 8, 9). The Magistrate Judge has issued a report and recommendation in this case. (ECF No. 5 .) Since then, Plaintiff's mail has been returned as undeliverable. (ECF No. 6 .) Plaintiff shall have until December 13, 2024 to provide the Court with an updated address. Plaintiff shall also have until December 13, 2024 to object to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation, if they wish to do so. If Plaintiff does not update their address by December 13, 2024, this case will be subject to dismissal under Local Rules IA 11-8 and IA 3-1. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
10 10 order Judgment Thu 10/17 3:05 PM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF 9 Minute Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
9 9 minord Minute Order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Report and Recommendation Thu 10/17 11:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/17/2024. On October 2, the Court notified Plaintiff that if they did not update their address by October 16, this case would be subject to dismissal under Local Rules IA 11-8 and IA 3-1. (ECF No. 8 .) Plaintiff has not updated their address by the set deadline. It is therefore ordered that the Magistrate Judge's Report & Recommendation (ECF No. 5 ), recommending dismissal without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to update their address is ADOPTED. It is further ordered that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Local Rules IA 11-8 and IA 3-1. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case accordingly. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
minord Minute Order Wed 10/02 1:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/2/2024. Notice of Compliance is due by 10/16/2024. On August 16, 2024, the Court ordered Plaintiff to update their address by August 23, 2024 and file any objections to the Magistrate Judges report and recommendation(ECF No.5 ) by September 6, 2024. (ECF No. 7 ). Plaintiff has not updated their address or filed an objection by the set deadline. If Plaintiff does not update their address by October 16, 2024, this case will be subject to dismissal under Local Rules IA 11-8 and IA 3-1. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMB)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
minord Minute Order Fri 08/16 11:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 8/16/2024. The Magistrate Judge has issued a report and recommendation in this case. (ECF No. 5 .) Plaintiff's mail has since been returned as undeliverable. (ECF No. 6 .) Plaintiff shall have until August 23, 2024 to provide the Court with an updated address. He shall have until September 6, 2024 to object to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation, if he wishes to do so. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DWU)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
6 6 misc Mail Returned Fri 10/27 12:19 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No.5 Report and Recommendation addressed to Keon Williams. (GA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
5 5 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 10/20 2:36 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommend dismissing action without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 10/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
4 4 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/15 2:53 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No.3 Order, addressed to Keon Williams. IFP Form/Instructions also enclosed. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/02 10:41 AM
ORDER - The Clerk shall SEND Plaintiff a copy of the instructions and IFP application for a non-prisoner. (Mailed 8/2/2023). Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this Order (9/1/2023) to either file his completed IFP Application or pay the full filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 8/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Wed 03/08 11:00 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 03/08 8:28 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 03/08 9:31 AM
Case randomly re-assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/08 10:41 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keon Williams.(CJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Brief,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet