Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-00368
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2023
Terminated:Mar 10, 2023
Last checked: Monday Sep 04, 2023 2:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Crystal Bay Casino, LLC
14 State Highway 28
Crystal Bay, NV 89402
Plaintiff
Fernando Mendoza
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated c/o Law Office of Telia U. Williams 10161 Park Run Dr Ste 150
Las Vegas, NV 89145
Represented By
Jesse Chen
contact info
Jennifer Leinbach
contact info
Thiago Coelho
Wilshire Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Seth Aaron Bayles
Bayles Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jesenia Martinez
contact info
Carolin Shining
contact info
Plaintiff
Sophia Mendoza
Represented By
Jesse Chen
contact info
Jennifer Leinbach
contact info
Thiago Coelho
Wilshire Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Seth Aaron Bayles
Bayles Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jesenia Martinez
contact info
Carolin Shining
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 09, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/09 10:18 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fernando Mendoza, Sophia Mendoza. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bayles, Seth)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/09 9:47 AM
ORDER. This action is transferred to the unofficial northern division of this court for all further proceedings. The clerk of the court shall transfer and reopen this matter as a new action under a new docket number in the northern division, and the action under this docket number shall be closed, without prejudice to the plaintiffs regarding any federal limitation period and filing fee. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 03/08 2:41 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crystal Bay Casino, LLC re1 Complaint (HAM)
Related: [-]
7 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jesse S. Chen to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jesenia Martinez to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jennifer M. Leinbach to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Carolin K. Shining to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Thiago M. Coelho to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/08 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Crystal Bay Casino, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7229216) by Fernando mendoza. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/18/2023. Proof of service due by 6/6/2023. (Bayles, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 03/08 2:36 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Wed 03/08 2:23 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Thiago M. Coelho to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Wed 03/08 2:24 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Carolin K. Shining to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Wed 03/08 2:25 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jennifer M. Leinbach to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Wed 03/08 2:26 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jesenia Martinez to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Wed 03/08 2:27 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jesse S. Chen to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2023. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Wed 03/08 2:37 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]