California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:23-cv-01749
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2023
Terminated:May 10, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Cedina M Kim
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Cedina M Kim
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Cedina M Kim
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
David M Radel
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Cedina M Kim
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Cedina M Kim
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Hripsime Karapoghosyan
Represented By
Sassoun A Nalbandian
Nalbandian Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
12 12 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 10/24 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Hripsime Karapoghosyan. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 05/10 12:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay the Case Pending Adjudication of Application (Doc.10 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the instant action shall be stayed until 2/7/2024. No later than that date, Plaintiff shall file a notice of dismissal or status report in the action. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp). Modified on 5/10/2023 (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
10 10 stip Stay Case Wed 05/03 3:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M Radel, USCIS.(Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Merrick B. Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party David M Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party USCIS(pty:dft))(Kim, Cedina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 10, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/10 3:00 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kmh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
8 8 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Thu 03/09 9:35 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hripsime Karapoghosyan, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Sassoun Nalbandian (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/08 3:58 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M Radel, USCIS. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/08 3:52 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/08 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 03/08 2:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)3 filed by Plaintiff HRIPSIME KARAPOGHOSYAN.(Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Attachment A,
Att: 2 Supplement Attachment B
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/08 2:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff HRIPSIME KARAPOGHOSYAN. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/08 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff HRIPSIME KARAPOGHOSYAN, (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/08 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34919621 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff HRIPSIME KARAPOGHOSYAN. (Attorney Sassoun A Nalbandian added to party HRIPSIME KARAPOGHOSYAN(pty:pla))(Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D