New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00272
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 09, 2023 12:18 AM MST
Defendant
Steven Williams (1)
Represented By
Angelica M Hall
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
George Rodriguez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brittany DuChaussee
Doj-Usao
contact info
Mark Probasco
Doj-Usao
contact info
Elisa Christine Dimas
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/09/2023 1:02 AM MST
Thursday, February 16, 2023
Arrest of Steven Williams (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to Steven Williams (1). (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
Case unsealed as to Steven Williams (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Steven Williams. Attorney Mark Probasco for USA added. Attorney Elisa Christine Dimas terminated. (nm) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Rodriguez, George) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING WITH VIDEO STREAMING as to Steven Williams: Initial Appearance set for 2/17/2023 at 11:15 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom - Remote before Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones. (kd) NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. *** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** This hearing will be available for remote viewing by video stream. Please visit the Court's website at[LINK:www.nmd.uscourts.gov] for information and instructions to connect. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Angelica M Hall for Steven Williams by Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones (nm) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones: Initial Appearance as to Steven Williams held; Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 2/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom Related [+] (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
6 6 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL ORDER of Temporary Detention pending hearing as to Steven Williams by Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Personal Presence at Hearing by Steven Williams (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
10 10 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Steven Williams held Related [+] (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Steven Williams (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Right to Contest Detention Hearing by Steven Williams (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Steven Williams by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen (kd) [1:23-mj-00304-BPB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
Judge update in case as to Steven Williams. District Judge Matthew L. Garcia added. (kd)
Related: [-]
15 15 REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Steven Williams. (cl)
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Steven Williams: Arraignment set for 3/16/2023 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones. (cl) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]