New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:22-mj-01309
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2022
Terminated:Dec 08, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 09, 2023 2:43 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Miriam Glaser Dauermann
Doj-Crm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
(2) 3910 Church Avenue, Brooklyn, NY 11203 (2)
Terminated: 12/08/2022
Defendant
In the matter of the search of (1) 1101 Banner Ave, second floor, Brooklyn, NY 11235 (1)
Terminated: 12/08/2022


Docket last updated: 03/09/2023 3:00 AM EST
Thursday, December 08, 2022
1 1 Application for Search Warrant as to In the matter of the search of (1) 1101 Banner Ave, second floor, Brooklyn, NY 11235, (2) 3910 Church Avenue, Brooklyn, NY 11203. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/08/2022. (MS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealing Cover Sheet