Beck v. Sisolak, et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00362 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
90 | 90
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 05/12 2:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/12/2025. By Law Clerk: K. Reeves. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order Directing Defendants [to] Provide Plaintiff Access to Medical Records (ECF No. 85 ). The Court notes that although Defendants characterize Plaintiff as seeking a preliminary injunction, and argue such relief is inappropriate (ECF No. 87 at 2-5), the Motion seeks an order directing Defendants "to produce Plaintiff's medical records." ECF No. 85 at 3. The Court therefore construes the Motion as a Motion to Compel. Defendants have arranged an appointment for Plaintiff to view his medical records on May 13, 2025, one day after the date of this Order. ECF No. 88 at 5. The Court is pleased that Defendants have done so; however, the Court requires further assurances that Plaintiff will be able to document and request the specific records necessary to respond to the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Court Order (ECF No. 85 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants must ensure Plaintiff has a writing utensil (pen or pencil) and notepad during his appointment to view his medical records. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must be provided some means for noting which pages of the records he seeks copied. Plaintiff must pay for all copies requested. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that provided Plaintiff has funds to pay for copies, Defendants must ensure any copies requested by Plaintiff are provided no later than May 16, 2025 . (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KBR) |
|
89 | 89
![]() RESPONSE to86 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants Michael Minev, Julie Williams, Benjamin Guttierrez, G. Taino, Jaymie Cabrera, Chris Nehls, Wilson Bernales. (Claus, Nathan) |
|
88 | 88
![]() RESPONSE to85 Motion by Defendants Michael Minev, Julie Williams, Benjamin Guttierrez, G. Taino, Jaymie Cabrera, Chris Nehls, Wilson Bernales. Replies due by 5/19/2025. (Claus, Nathan) |
|
87 | 87
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Mon 05/12 11:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/12/2025. Plaintiff indicates to the Court that he is having trouble obtaining copies of his medical records necessary to oppose Defendants' pending motion for summary judgment. (ECF Nos.84 ,85 ,86 .) Because Defendants moved for summary judgment on Plaintiff's sole claim for deliberate indifference to serious medical needs (ECF No.74 ), the Court agrees with Plaintiff that he would need copies of his medical records to adequately oppose the motion. To that end, the Court orders Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's 'motion for court order' (ECF No.85 ) in an expedited fashion, and by no later than May 16, 2025. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No.86 ) is granted as well, to give Plaintiff an additional opportunity to oppose the motion for summary judgment with reference to his medical records. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's opposition to the motion for summary judgment is due June 25, 2025. However, the Court cautions Plaintiff that it is very unlikely to grant any further extensions of this deadline because the Court must resolve pending motions in a timely manner. (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TH) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
86 | 86
![]() MOTION to Extend Time to File Opposition to74 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff Stanley Beck. Responses due by 5/23/2025. (DRM) (sumjgm) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
85 | 85
![]() MOTION for Court Order by Plaintiff Stanley Beck. Responses due by 5/21/2025. (GA) (misc) (nondispositive) |