Mathis v. Thunell et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00364 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 03, 2023 3:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
M. Amburgey
|
|
Defendant
Blue Knight Transport
|
|
Defendant
Patricia Houlihan
|
|
Defendant
Natasha Koch
|
|
Defendant
Las Vegas Metro Police
|
|
Defendant
Jess Marchese
|
|
Defendant
State of Oregon DOC
|
|
Defendant
Peter Thunell
|
|
Defendant
Erling Oster
|
|
Defendant
Ashley St. Clair
|
|
Plaintiff
Dontae Mathis
1261532 High Desert State Prison PO Box 650
Indian Springs, NV 89070 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/24 11:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice by Plaintiff Dontae Mathis. Responses due by 6/6/2023. (LOE) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 05/25 3:09 PM
Civil Case Terminated per10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (EDS) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/18 2:03 PM
ORDER re8 Financial Certificate. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a complete application to proceed in Jonna pauperis no later than May 18, 2023. Plaintiff does not need to resubmit a signed financial certificate or inmate account statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Financial Affidavit
Mon 04/17 9:01 AM
FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Dontae Mathis (CJS) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice Other
Mon 04/17 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Compliance by Dontae Mathis re ECF No.3 Order. (CJS) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Fri 04/07 11:21 AM
ORDER Granting4 Motion to Extend Time to file a complete application to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee for this case no later than 05/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint Amended
Thu 04/06 9:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against M. Amburgey, Blue Knight Transport, Patricia Houlihan, Natasha Koch, Las Vegas Metro Police, Jess Marchese, State of Oregon DOC, Peter Thunell, Ashley St. Clair, Erling Oster by Dontae Mathis. Adds new parties. (CJS) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion Extend/Shorten Time
Thu 04/06 8:59 AM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re ECF No.3 Order, by Plaintiff Dontae Mathis. Responses due by 4/20/2023. (CJS) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/09 1:18 PM
ORDER re1 Complaint. It is ordered that Plaintiff shall either make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee, accompanied by a copy of this order, or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must comply with this order no later than April 14, 2023. Failure to comply will result in a recommendation to the District Judge that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Inmate IFP sent to Plaintiff - LOE) |
|
Att: 1 Inmate IFP | ||
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Wed 03/08 10:13 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CJS) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Wed 03/08 10:11 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (CJS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint |