Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:23-cv-00256
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
BGC Holdings, L.P.
Represented By
Eric G. Hoffman
contact info
Mitchell Nobel
contact info
Robert M. Vrana
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Benjamin R. Nagin
contact info
Anne Shea Gaza
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
contact info
David A. Paul
contact info
Defendant
Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P.
Represented By
Eric G. Hoffman
contact info
Mitchell Nobel
contact info
Robert M. Vrana
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Benjamin R. Nagin
contact info
Anne Shea Gaza
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
contact info
David A. Paul
contact info
Defendant
Newmark Holdings, L.P.
Represented By
Eric G. Hoffman
contact info
Mitchell Nobel
contact info
Robert M. Vrana
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Benjamin R. Nagin
contact info
Anne Shea Gaza
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Tacy F. Flint
contact info
David A. Paul
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheyne Bunnett
Represented By
Kyle Roche
contact info
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Lewis
Represented By
Kyle Roche
contact info
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawn McLoughlin
Represented By
Kyle Roche
contact info
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Miller
Represented By
Kyle Roche
contact info
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
Tom Robertshaw
Represented By
Kyle Roche
contact info
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
Olivia Scott
Represented By
Kyle Roche
contact info
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
Angelo Sofocleus
Represented By
Kyle Roche
contact info
Blake A. Bennett
Cooch And Taylor
contact info

GPO Dec 02 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/2/2024. (mws)
GPO Dec 02 2024
ORDER: It is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 44) is GRANTED. All Counts of the Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/2/2024. (mws)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
58 58 appeal - - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit Wed 12/18 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re57 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Cheyne Bunnett, Andrew Lewis, Olivia Scott, Tom Robertshaw, Shawn McLoughlin, Angelo Sofocleus, Robert Miller. USCA Case Number 24-3346 USCA Case Manager: Laurie (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (lr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
appeal - APPEAL - Credit Card Payment (Attorneys Only) Tue 12/17 9:54 AM
APPEAL - Credit Card Payment received re57 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Cheyne Bunnett, Andrew Lewis, Olivia Scott, Tom Robertshaw, Shawn McLoughlin, Angelo Sofocleus, Robert Miller. ( Filing fee $605, receipt number ADEDC-4572020.) (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
57 57 appeal - NOTICE OF APPEAL - Third Circuit Mon 12/16 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL of54 Memorandum and Order, Terminate Motions . Appeal filed by Shawn McLoughlin, Robert Miller, Angelo Sofocleus, Andrew Lewis, Cheyne Bunnett, Tom Robertshaw, Olivia Scott. (Bennett, Blake)
Related: [-]
56 56 order SO ORDERED Mon 12/16 9:48 AM
SO ORDERED, re55 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file motions seeking attorneys' fees and costs under, inter alia, Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d), and D. Del. LR 54.1 to a date that is fourteen (14) days after the later of: (i) the issuance of the mandate from the Third Circuit or opinion or order of the United States Supreme Court in this action; or (ii) the denial of any Petition for Rehearing or Rehearing En Banc by the Third Circuit or any Petition for Writ of Certiorari by the United States Supreme Court in this action, filed by Newmark Holdings, L.P., BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/16/2024. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 15, 2024
55 55 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Sun 12/15 3:55 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file motions seeking attorneys' fees and costs under, inter alia, Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d), and D. Del. LR 54.1 to a date that is fourteen (14) days after the later of: (i) the issuance of the mandate from the Third Circuit or opinion or order of the United States Supreme Court in this action; or (ii) the denial of any Petition for Rehearing or Rehearing En Banc by the Third Circuit or any Petition for Writ of Certiorari by the United States Supreme Court in this action. - filed by Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., BGC Holdings, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P.. (Vrana, Robert)
Related: [-]