California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:23-cv-01770
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:May 04, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Cedina M Kim
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Cedina M Kim
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Cedina M Kim
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Samer Alkassis
Represented By
Scott A Emerick
Bolour Carl Immigration Group Apc
contact info
Scott A. Emerick
Bolour Carl Immigration Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 04, 2023
10 10 order Dismissing Case Thu 05/04 4:08 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a joint stipulation to stay the case until 2/9/2024, based on the parties' agreement that USCIS will interview Plaintiff on 9/28/20239 . It appears that the more efficient approach is to dismiss this action without prejudice to either party moving to reopen nunc pro tunc in the event that further Court intervention becomes necessary. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice to any party seeking to vacate this order and reopen the action nunc pro tunc in the event that Plaintiff is unable to receive a determination in the time contemplated by the parties. Any party who objects to the dismissal of this action as ordered herein shall file a request to reopen the case no later than seven days after entry of this order. Failure to timely file a request to reopen the case will be deemed consent to dismissal as ordered. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
9 9 stip Stay Case Wed 05/03 2:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas.(Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft))(Kim, Cedina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 10, 2023
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/10 3:19 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 3:02 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Merrick Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (lh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons as to Defendant Ur M. Jaddou,
Att: 2 Summons as to Defendant Merrick Garland
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/09 2:54 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/09 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 03/09 9:49 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Samer Alkassis.(Emerick, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons Defendant Jaddou,
Att: 2 Supplement Summons Defendant Garland
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/09 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Samer Alkassis, identifying none known at this time. (Emerick, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/09 9:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Samer Alkassis. (Emerick, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 9:46 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34923798 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Samer Alkassis. (Attorney Scott A Emerick added to party Samer Alkassis(pty:pla))(Emerick, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit I-589 Receipt Notice