NB Gathering IX Pref, LLC, LLC v. Patrick Nelson
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01772 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Northern District of Texas, 3:20-CV-3491-K |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Patrick Nelson
|
|
Plaintiff
NB GATHERING IX PREF, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of New Case Number / Judge Assignment (CV-15) - optional html form
Mon 03/13 4:09 PM
NOTICE of New Case Number by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type CV to case type MC because the incorrect case type was used at case opening. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 2:23-mc-00035-UA. The previous case number, 2:23-cv-01772, is hereby terminated. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case
Thu 03/09 10:18 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-34924161 - Fee: $49, filed by Plaintiff NB GATHERING IX PREF, LLC. (Attorney Helen H. Yang added to party NB GATHERING IX PREF, LLC(pty:pla))(Yang, Helen) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Judgment |