California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 2:23-cv-01777
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV02540
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:52 AM PDT
Defendant
M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.
Represented By
Jannine E Kranz
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.
Represented By
Jannine E Kranz
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wafaa Kassamani
Represented By
Donald James Aaron Brock
Brock And Gonzales LLP
contact info
Lindsay L Bowden
Brock And Gonzales LLP
contact info
Douglas Hayes
Brock And Gonzales LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
23 23 order Dismissing Case Wed 02/07 7:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)22 , THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorneys' fees and costs. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
22 22 3 pgs stip Order Wed 01/31 5:45 PM
STIPULATION for Order Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by Defendant Estee Lauder Companies, Inc..(Kranz, Jannine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
21 21 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 01/31 10:16 AM
ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case19 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Counsel shall immediately file a Proposed Order and email a Microsoft Word version of the Proposed Order to the chambers email address. (rolm)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 01/30 7:23 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Case19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Parties stipulate to dismissal under F.R.Civ.P. 41(a). This Stipulation requires the judge's approval, as an answer was filed in the matter prior to removal. Proposed Order not submitted herewith. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
19 19 stip Dismiss Case Thu 01/25 3:01 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) filed by Defendant Estee Lauder Companies, Inc..(Kranz, Jannine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/26 1:19 PM
ORDER RE: JURY/COURT TRIAL I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates: Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 6/28/2024 11:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 7/16/2024 08:30 AM. See order for other deadlines. (lom)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Tue 04/25 3:27 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/19/2024. (cb)
Related: [-]
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/25 3:27 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the April 28, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
15 15 misc Report Thu 04/13 11:23 AM
Joint Scheduling REPORT filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani.(Bowden, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET
14 14 misc Report Thu 04/13 10:43 AM
Joint Scheduling REPORT filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani. (Bowden, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
13 13 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 03/28 11:26 AM
Plaintiff's Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani (Brock, Donald)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 03/28 11:23 AM
Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial (Brock, Donald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
11 11 notice Appearance Thu 03/23 6:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Donald James Aaron Brock on behalf of Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani (Brock, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 03/10 9:25 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/10 9:23 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/09 4:31 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/09 4:30 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/09 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Thu 03/09 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.. (Kranz, Jannine)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/09 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc., (Kranz, Jannine)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/09 11:53 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc. identifying Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Kranz, Jannine)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/09 11:52 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.. (Kranz, Jannine)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV02540 Receipt No: ACACDC-34925396 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc., ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attorney Jannine E Kranz added to party ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Jannine E Kranz added to party M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kranz, Jannine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lacey Moore,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jannine Kranz,
Att: 3 25 pgs Exhibit A to Kranz Declaration: Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Kranz Declaration: Notice of Case Management Conference,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Kranz Declaration: Defendant Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.'s Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Kranz Declaration: Defendant M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.'s Answer,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 03/09 4:01 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc. Jury Demanded. filed by Plaintiff Wafaa Kassamani.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT LEGIBLE SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/09 4:03 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/07/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 EXHIBIT C TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/09 4:04 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant M.A.C. Cosmetics, Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/07/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 EXHIBIT D TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]