California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 2:23-cv-01778
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Spin Copter Inc.
Represented By
David Kerr
Berg Hill Greenleaf Ruscitti
contact info
Plaintiff
Flying Heliball LLC
Represented By
Sterling Arthur Brennan
Maschoff Brennan
contact info
Christina Le Trinh
Maschoff Brennan
contact info
Collin D. Hansen
Workman Nydegger
contact info
Brian N. Platt
Workman Nydegger
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
24 24 judgmentCV Permanent Injunction Tue 05/09 3:35 PM
STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL OF LITIGATION filed by Judge George H. Wu. The Parties have stipulated and agreed to entry of this permanent injunction pursuant to the Settlement Agreement between them. Defendant, its officers, agents, servants, employees, and all persons acting in active concert or participation with it who receives actual notice of this injunction by personal service or otherwise, is hereby permanently enjoined from directly or indirectly making, having made, using, selling, advertising, manufacturing, importing, or distributing the Accused Products or any colorable imitation thereof, which infringes, literally or equivalently, directly or indirectly, any claim of U.S. Patent No. 7,100,866 until the Asserted Patent expires or is no longer in force. The Complaint against the Defendant is dismissed with prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
23 23 stip Permanent Injunction Dismiss Case Mon 05/08 1:54 PM
STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction, STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 65(d) and Settlement of the Parties filed by Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC.(Trinh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
22 22 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Thu 04/27 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David Kerr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lom)
Related: [-]
21 21 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 04/26 10:43 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Spin Copter Inc. answer now due 5/26/2023, filed by Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC.(Trinh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
20 20 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/20 10:22 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H. Wu. APPLICATION of Attorney Brian N. Platt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC, designating Sterling A. Brennan as local counsel.; GRANTING18 Non-Resident Attorney Brian N. Platt. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
19 19 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/18 12:12 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE17 by Judge George H. Wu. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC, designating Sterling Arthur Brennan as local counsel. Granting17 Non-Resident Attorney Collin D. Hansen. (rolm)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 04/18 10:37 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian N. Platt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 4/4/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-35076386) filed by Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Certification of Status History,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, April 14, 2023
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 04/14 6:16 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Collin D. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 4/4/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-35075853) filed by Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 13, 2023
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/13 10:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC, upon Defendant Spin Copter Inc. served on 4/5/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melissa Pisor, Chief Financial Officer in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
15 15 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 04/06 2:33 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Collin D. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35075853)12 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian N. Platt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35076386)13 by Judge George H. Wu. Docket No. 12 and 13 are stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice14 filed on April 6, 2023. Pursuant to L.R. 5-4.4.2, email the proposed order in either Word or Word Perfect to Judge Wu's email address at GW_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov Related [+]. (aco)
Related: [-] submit
14 14 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Thu 04/06 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Collin D. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35075853)12 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian N. Platt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35076386)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (sbou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 04/04 12:01 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian N. Platt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35076386) filed by Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 04/04 11:55 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Collin D. Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35075853) filed by Plaintiff Flying Heliball LLC. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 10, 2023
11 11 10 pgs order Order Fri 03/10 10:55 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Transfer Pursuant to Patent Program (CV-128) Fri 03/10 9:40 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge John F. Walter. Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:23-cv-01778-GW (KESx). (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 4:23 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Spin Copter Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/09 4:08 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/09 4:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/09 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Thu 03/09 12:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff FLYING HELIBALL, LLC. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/09 12:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff FLYING HELIBALL, LLC identifying World Tech Toys, Inc. and Kev Kouyoumjian (Owner) as Corporate Parent. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Thu 03/09 12:00 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by FLYING HELIBALL, LLC. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/09 11:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff FLYING HELIBALL, LLC. (Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34925471 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff FLYING HELIBALL, LLC. (Attorney Sterling Arthur Brennan added to party FLYING HELIBALL, LLC(pty:pla))(Brennan, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C