Melina Hird v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00423 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melina Hird
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties, defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC is dismissed with prejudice and each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs29 . (es) |
|
31 | 31
![]() ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties, defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice and each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs.30 (es) |
|
30 | 30
![]() STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird.(Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird.(Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court, having been notified by the plaintiff that this action has been settled24 27 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders ALL proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC) filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() STATEMENT (of Plaintiff's Counsel to Request Appearance by Telephone at the July 10, 2023 Continued Scheduling Conference) re: Scheduling Conference - optional html form,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,25 . (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (not held) before Judge David O. Carter. The parties inform the Court that a settlement has been reached between plaintiff and defendant Experian. Notice of settlement to be filed by noon June 27, 2023. Plaintiff shall return July 10, 2023 at 7:30 AM for a scheduling conference with remaining defendant. If notice of settlement is filed by 12:00 PM on July 7, 2023, the scheduling conference will be vacated. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2023 at 07:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb) |
|
Sunday, June 25, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 06/21 4:55 PM
ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter DENYING STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference21 . Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions are required to appear June 26, 2023 at 7:30 AM with all persons, parties, clients, and/or individuals of whom have full settlement authority. Counsel for defendant Equifax Information Services is EXCUSED from June 26th proceedings are are ordered to appear July 10, 2023 at 7:30 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird.. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
21 | 21
![]() STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 26, 2023 to July 3, 2023 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only16 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird.. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelly Christine Albright counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Kelly Albright is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Albright, Kelly) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Lopez counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Adding Amy Lopez as counsel of record for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Amy Lopez added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lopez, Amy) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Albright, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Albright, Kelly) |
|
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 5/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Kelly Christine Albright added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Albright, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas) |
|
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 5/3/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Melina Hird, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz - C.T. Corp Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird, (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34925486 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Attorney Joseph Brian Angelo added to party Melina Hird(pty:pla))(Angelo, Joseph) |