California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:23-cv-00423
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:Jul 05, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By
Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Nokes And Quinn Apc
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Lopez
Jones Day
contact info
Kelly Christine Albright
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Melina Hird
Represented By
Joseph Brian Angelo
Gale Angelo Johnson And Patrick PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 11/16 10:39 AM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties, defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC is dismissed with prejudice and each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs29 . (es)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 11/15 12:24 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties, defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice and each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs.30 (es)
Related: [-]
30 30 stip Dismiss Party Wed 11/15 8:30 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird.(Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 25, 2023
29 29 stip Dismiss Party Mon 09/25 9:34 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird.(Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
28 28 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/05 4:42 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court, having been notified by the plaintiff that this action has been settled24 27 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders ALL proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Settlement Wed 07/05 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC) filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
26 26 misc Statement Mon 07/03 4:09 PM
STATEMENT (of Plaintiff's Counsel to Request Appearance by Telephone at the July 10, 2023 Continued Scheduling Conference) re: Scheduling Conference - optional html form,,, Set/Reset Hearing,,25 . (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
25 25 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 06/29 3:51 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (not held) before Judge David O. Carter. The parties inform the Court that a settlement has been reached between plaintiff and defendant Experian. Notice of settlement to be filed by noon June 27, 2023. Plaintiff shall return July 10, 2023 at 7:30 AM for a scheduling conference with remaining defendant. If notice of settlement is filed by 12:00 PM on July 7, 2023, the scheduling conference will be vacated. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2023 at 07:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 25, 2023
24 24 notice Settlement Sun 06/25 9:48 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
23 23 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 06/21 4:55 PM
ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter DENYING STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference21 . Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions are required to appear June 26, 2023 at 7:30 AM with all persons, parties, clients, and/or individuals of whom have full settlement authority. Counsel for defendant Equifax Information Services is EXCUSED from June 26th proceedings are are ordered to appear July 10, 2023 at 7:30 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
22 22 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 06/20 10:18 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird.. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
21 21 stip Continue Tue 06/20 10:03 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 26, 2023 to July 3, 2023 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only16 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order continuing Scheduling Conference
Monday, June 12, 2023
20 20 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 06/12 7:59 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird.. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 06/08 4:41 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelly Christine Albright counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Kelly Albright is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Albright, Kelly)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 06/08 4:35 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Lopez counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Adding Amy Lopez as counsel of record for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Amy Lopez added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lopez, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/12 4:35 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Albright, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
16 16 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 05/11 9:10 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/03 12:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 04/13 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Albright, Kelly)
Related: [-]
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 04/13 1:37 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 5/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Kelly Christine Albright added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Albright, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/04 12:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Equifax Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 04/04 12:36 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 5/3/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/28 3:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Melina Hird, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz - C.T. Corp Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/21 10:56 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 11:29 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 11:17 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/13 11:17 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 03/09 12:20 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/09 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird, (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/09 11:46 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34925486 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Melina Hird. (Attorney Joseph Brian Angelo added to party Melina Hird(pty:pla))(Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]