Nevada District Court
Judge:Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-00373
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:Oct 18, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, January 08, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 01/09 12:12 PM
ORDER Granting20 Stipulation For The Award And Payment Of Attorney Fees And Expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/8/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Stipulation Mon 01/08 2:05 PM
STIPULATION For The Award And Payment Of Attorney Fees And Expenses Pursuant To The Equal Access To Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(D) And Costs Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1920 by Plaintiff Maria Lourdes Duran. (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
19 19 order Judgment Thu 10/19 3:31 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff, Marla Lourdes Duran, and against Defendant, Kilolo Kijakazi. Case Closed. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
18 18 order XX - Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction TURNED OFF Thu 10/19 3:29 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's10 Brief, seeking remand and an award of benefits is GRANTED. This case is remanded for an immediate award of benefits. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
17 17 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 09/12 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael James Mullen on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Mullen, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
16 16 respm Reply Brief (for social security cases only) Mon 08/21 4:50 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Commissioner Brief by Plaintiff Maria Lourdes Duran. (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Plaintiff Brief (for social security cases only) Mon 08/21 4:20 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Plaintiff Maria Lourdes Duran. Responses due by 9/20/2023. (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
14 14 respm Response Mon 08/07 1:04 PM
RESPONSE to10 Brief by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Staples, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Unopposed Motion Fri 07/07 12:55 PM
ORDER Granting12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time re10 Opening Brief. Responses due by 8/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Unopposed Motion Fri 07/07 10:35 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time re10 Brief by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. Responses due by 7/21/2023. (Staples, Jeff) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
11 11 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Fri 06/23 8:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeff Staples on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Staples, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
10 10 respm Brief Wed 06/07 3:56 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Maria Lourdes Duran. . (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
9 9 notice Notice Manual Filing in SS Appeal Case Mon 05/08 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.,, Description: Social Security Administrative Record, manually filed with the Magistrate Judge's chambers. (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certified Administrative Record Mon 05/08 9:54 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (CAR) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Electronic access to the CAR is restricted to case participants only.) (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Administrative Record
7 7 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Mon 05/08 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Blaine T Welsh on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Welsh, Blaine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
6 6 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 03/21 8:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney L. Jamala Edwards on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Edwards, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
5 5 misc Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in SS Case Fri 03/10 10:33 AM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Fri 03/10 9:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi by Maria Lourdes Duran. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/20/2023. Proof of service due by 6/8/2023. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/10 9:38 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No.1 -1) will proceed against Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must detach and file Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No.1 -1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall familiarize herself with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) found in the Federal Civil Judicial Procedure and Rules 2022 Revised Edition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Assignment of Case to MJ & Consent Form in SS Case Thu 03/09 1:09 PM
NOTICE pursuant to General Order 2019-08: This case has been randomly assigned to a Magistrate Judge pending the parties' consent or declination. Pursuant to 28 USC § 636(c), with written consent of all parties, a Magistrate Judge may conduct all proceedings in a case, including all pretrial and trial proceedings, entry of judgment, and post-trial motions. Any appeals will be made directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. A link is being provided to the form on the court's website to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (A copy of the notice and consent form have been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) Consent or declination due by 3/19/2023. (HAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/09 11:16 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maria Lourdes Duran.(Kalagian, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 03/09 1:07 PM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
Related: [-]