Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Referred: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Case #: 1:23-cv-00612
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:Oct 30, 2023
Case in other court:El Paso County District Court, 2023CV30011
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 3:39 AM MDT
Defendant
United States Liability Insurance Company
Represented By
Katia K. Conrad
Litchfield Cavo, LLP
contact info
Vincent Justin Velardo
Litchfield Cavo, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Traci Bryan
Represented By
Alex D. Kerr
Alex D. Kerr PC
contact info

GPO Oct 30 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Amended Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. 15-22] is dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/30/2023. (ebuch)

Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Monday, September 16, 2024
41 41 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 09/18 9:42 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to40 USCA Order/Opinion/Judgment,36 Notice of Appeal filed by Traci Bryan : (USCA Case No. 23-1374 (norlin, )
Related: [-]
40 40 appeal USCA Order/Opinion/Judgment Wed 09/18 9:39 AM
USCA Order as to36 Notice of Appeal filed by Traci Bryan : (USCA Case No. 23-1374 (This document is not the Mandate) In accordance with 10th Cir. R. 33.1 and upon consideration of the stipulation of the parties to voluntarily dismiss the captioned appeal, this appeal is dismissed. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
39 39 appeal Letter re Record Complete Thu 12/14 2:49 PM
LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to36 Notice of Appeal filed by Traci Bryan. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 23-1374 Text Only Entry (angar, )
Related: [-]
38 38 appeal Transcript Order Form Thu 12/14 10:36 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re36 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Traci Bryan (Kerr, Alex)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
37 37 appeal Letter Transmitting Notice of Appeal Thu 11/30 9:54 AM
LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the36 Notice of Appeal filed by Traci Bryan to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,)(norlin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Record on Appeal,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet
36 36 appeal Notice of Appeal - 10th Circuit Tue 11/28 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to35 Judgment,34 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Traci Bryan (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number ACODC-9415098) (Kerr, Alex)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
35 35 order Judgment Mon 10/30 12:32 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of United States Liability Insurance Company and against Traci Bryan pursuant to34 Memorandum Opinion & Order, by Clerk on 10/30/2023. (ebuch)
Related: [-]
34 34 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/30 12:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Amended Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. 15-22] is dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/30/2023. (ebuch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
33 33 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 09/19 6:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER: denying31 the Joint Motion to Amend Civil Scheduling Order. The Motion is DENIED without prejudice to refiling, given the parties' failure to demonstrate that they have been diligent in their efforts during the allotted time, as required by MDB Revised Practice Standards for Civil Cases VII.C. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 09/19/2023. Text Only Entry(mdblc4,)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
32 32 order Memorandum Thu 09/14 8:37 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding31 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify the28 Scheduling Order filed by Traci Bryan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/14/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc6, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
31 31 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 09/13 8:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify28 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Traci Bryan.(Kerr, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Civil Scheduling Order
Thursday, May 18, 2023
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/18 2:47 PM
REPLY to Response to21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
29 29 respm Response to Motion Thu 05/04 11:23 AM
RESPONSE to21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Traci Bryan. (Kerr, Alex)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
28 28 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/26 12:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/10/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/24/2023. (evaug)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 04/26 12:27 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell: Scheduling Conference held on 4/24/2023. FTR: Courtroom 101. (evaug)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/11 9:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the parties'23 Proposed Scheduling Order, a Scheduling Conference is SET for April 24, 2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted entirely BY VIDEO , and all necessary parties SHALL attend by that means. Please see the attached instructions on how to participate by video means . By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 04/11/23. Text Only Entry (mdblc2)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/10 5:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting22 Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff's Responsive Pleading. Plaintiff shall have until May 4, 2023 within which to file a response to the21 Motion to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 04/10/23. Text Only Entry(mdblc2)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Memorandum Mon 04/10 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Traci Bryan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/10/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 04/10 2:18 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Traci Bryan. (Kerr, Alex)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/10 2:10 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Traci Bryan. (Kerr, Alex)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/23 3:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
20 20 4 pgs order Order Tue 03/21 5:46 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/10/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 3/21/2023. (evaug )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
19 19 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/20 9:12 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/20/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
18 18 order Minute Order Fri 03/17 5:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the representations in the Response to Order to Show Cause17 , the Order to Show Cause9 is hereby DISCHARGED . By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/17/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 03/17 4:34 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re9 by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company.(Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Police Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Alex Kerr
16 16 misc Supplement/Amendment Fri 03/17 4:24 PM
SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company.(Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Application
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/17 4:04 PM
NOTICE REGISTER OF ACTIONS - STATE COURT by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company(Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2023CV30011_21_2023-01-03_Civil_Case_Cover_Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2023CV30011_21_2023-01-03_Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2023CV30011_21_2023-01-03_Complaint_w_Jury_Demand,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 13 Exhibit 10 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 14 Exhibit 11 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 15 Exhibit 12 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 16 Exhibit 13 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 17 Exhibit 14 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 18 Exhibit 15 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 19 Exhibit 16 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 20 Exhibit 17 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 21 Exhibit 18 to State Court Complaint,
Att: 22 Exhibit 2023CV30011_21_2023-01-05_Complaint___Amended,
Att: 23 Exhibit 2023CV30011_21_2023-02-03_Affidavit_Of_Service USLGI,
Att: 24 Exhibit 2023CV30011_21_2023-02-24_Affidavit_Of_Service_William_Rogers_Dietz,
Att: 25 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal with Exhibit (Bryan v. USLI)
14 14 misc Supplement/Amendment Fri 03/17 2:52 PM
SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 03/16 10:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend the Deadline for Defendant's Responsive Pleading ("Motion")12 . The Court CONSTRUES the Motion as self-effectuating pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a), which provides in relevant part that "[t]he parties may stipulate in writing to one extension of not more than 21 days beyond the time limits prescribed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to respond to a pleading or amended pleading." Accordingly, Defendant's answer is due 3/23/2023. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/16/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 03/15 4:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re4 Complaint by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Exhibits Wed 03/15 11:29 AM
Exhibits in Support of1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company.(Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 17 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to Exhibit A of Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint
Friday, March 10, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/10 8:19 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Alex Kerr by Alex D. Kerr on behalf of Traci BryanAttorney Alex D. Kerr added to party Traci Bryan(pty:pla) (Kerr, Alex)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 03/10 2:24 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing and on or before March 17, 2023 , why this case should not be remanded for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/10/2023. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 03/09 2:40 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 03/09 2:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Administrative Notice Thu 03/09 2:31 PM
Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. § 1446(a) All State court documents were not submitted.See Appendix B Notice of Removal in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 03/09 2:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Cover Sheet, Amended Plaintiff's Complaint, Exhibits 1-8 upon United States Liability Insurance Company on 2/13/2023 (norlin, )
Related: [-]
4 4 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/09 2:28 PM
Plaintiff's COMPLAINT against United States Liability Insurance Company, filed by Traci Bryan.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Thu 03/09 2:25 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 03/09 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Vincent Justin Velardo on behalf of United States Liability Insurance CompanyAttorney Vincent Justin Velardo added to party United States Liability Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Velardo, Vincent)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/09 12:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Liability Insurance Company from District Court El Paso County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2023cv30011. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8980673), filed by United States Liability Insurance Company.(Conrad, Katia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet