Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company v. ABM Industries, Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00653 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc.
1 Liberty Plaza, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10006 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NIBCO, Inc.
1516 Middlebury Street,
Elkhart, IN 46516 |
|
Plaintiff
Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company
as subrogee of Westlake Park Condominium "B", Inc. 200 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
![]() ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 3/14/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 03/14 3:29 PM
Settlement Conference held on 3/14/2024 before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (bcs, Chambers) |
||
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
![]() LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 3/14/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/20/2023. (bcs, Chambers) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
![]() NOTICE by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company re34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Proposed Order (Mickey, Sameerah) |
|
36 | 36
![]() NOTICE by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company re33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Proposed Order (Dinterman, Michele) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 11/21 12:35 PM
Paperless ORDER granting33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michele Hayes Dinterman terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/21/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 11/21 12:36 PM
Paperless ORDER granting34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/21/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company(Mickey, Sameerah) |
|
33 | 33
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company(Dinterman, Michele) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 11/20 12:08 PM
QC NOTICE:33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company,34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to 33 , 34 . (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/9/2023. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Scott Dunbar on behalf of Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company (Dunbar, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Joint Correspondence re: Early ADR (Frederick, James) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER directing NIBCO, Inc. to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 11/30/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if NIBCO, Inc. files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 10/27/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
order
25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing
Fri 10/27 9:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:25 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 10/27/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
order
25 Pct Mag - ORDER: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge
Fri 10/27 9:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 10/27/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
order
Order
Fri 10/27 10:15 AM
Paperless ORDER requesting the parties file a proposed schedule within 14 days or file a status report stating why a Schediling Order is inappropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 10/27/2023. (cm6s, Chambers) |
||
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by James A Frederick on behalf of NIBCO, Inc. (Frederick, James) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NIBCO, Inc. (Frederick, James) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Defendant NIBCO Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint, by NIBCO, Inc..(Frederick, James) |
|
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Thu 10/12 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. NIBCO, Inc. or counsel for NIBCO, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/26/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ABM Industries, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Westway Services Holdings (2010) Ltd., Other Affiliate Westway Services Holdings (2014) Ltd., Other Affiliate ACE American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ABM Aviation, Inc., Other Affiliate ABM-All N 1 Security Services Inc., Other Affiliate ABM-Lanier-Hunt Airport Parking ATL, Other Affiliate Aviation Services Alliance, LLC, Other Affiliate Five Star U Street Metropolitan Washington Airport Parking, LLC, Other Affiliate FSP PPM Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Skyline Management Group, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM International Limited, Other Affiliate ABM International (Holdings) Ltd, Other Affiliate ABM Aviation UK Limited, Other Affiliate Air Serv Middle East Hospitality Services LLC, Other Affiliate OFJ Connections, Other Affiliate OFJ Airlinks Limited, Other Affiliate ABM Group UK Limited, Other Affiliate ABM Facilities Services UK Limited, Other Affiliate BRBIBR Limited, Other Affiliate ABM Critical Solutions Limited, Other Affiliate Ethos Farm Limited, Other Affiliate ABM International (Holdings) B.V., Other Affiliate ABM Onsite Services - Canada ULC, Other Affiliate ABM Technical Solutions Limited, Other Affiliate Maybin Support Services, Other Affiliate Momentum Property Support Services Limited, Other Affiliate Momentum Support Limited, Other Affiliate ABM Building & Energy Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM Building Services, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM Building Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM Canada Power Services Ltd, Other Affiliate ABM Electrical & Lighting Services, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM Electrical & Lighting Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate ABM Electrical Power Services, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM Electrical Power Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM Facility Support Services, LLC, Other Affiliate RenewEnergy Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM Franchising Group, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM General Services, Inc., Other Affiliate ABM Healthcare Support Services, Inc., Other Affiliate ABM Industrial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate ABM Industry Groups, LLC, Other Affiliate ABM Texas General Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Crown Building Maintenance Co., Other Affiliate AbleServe Management Company, Other Affiliate CBM MGMT LLC, Other Affiliate Crown Energy Services Inc., Other Affiliate Able Advantage Acquisition Inc., Other Affiliate AES MGMT LLC, Other Affiliate Grade Sub Two, LLC, Other Affiliate GCA Services Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Associated Facility Management, LLC, Other Affiliate GCA Cleaning Specialties, LP, Other Affiliate GCA Services Group Mountain States, LP, Other Affiliate GCA Services Group of Texas, LP, Other Affiliate Associated Facility Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate GCA Education Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Education Services Central States, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Education Services of New England, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA K12 Education Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Nuclear Facility Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Production Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Services Group of California, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Services Group of Colorado, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Services Group of North Carolina, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Services Group of Northwestern States, Inc., Other Affiliate GCA Staffing Services, Inc., Other Affiliate National Building Maintenance Corp., Other Affiliate IFM Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Linc International, Inc., Other Affiliate Linc Facility Services Iraq LLC, Other Affiliate Wassl Al-Iraq Project Services & General Contracting LLPC, Other Affiliate Linc Facility Services ME, LLC, Other Affiliate Linc Facility Services Saudi Arabia, LLC for ABM Industries, Inc..(Blake, Emily) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/10 8:23 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. ABM Industries, Inc. or counsel for ABM Industries, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/24/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 04/10 8:27 AM
QC NOTICE:14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by ABM Industries, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **All entities listed on the Corporate Disclosure must be added as a corporate parent/other affiliate when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ABM Industries, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, Other Affiliate SSgA Funds Management, Inc. for ABM Industries, Inc..(Blake, Emily) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, by ABM Industries, Inc..(Blake, Emily) |
|
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Miller (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10530588.) by ABM Industries, Inc.(Blake, Emily) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kathryn Blake on behalf of ABM Industries, Inc. (Blake, Emily) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/06 3:01 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of William Miller. Directing attorney William Miller to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company. NIBCO, Inc. served on 3/20/2023, answer due 4/10/2023.(Mickey, Sameerah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company. ABM Industries, Inc. served on 3/15/2023, answer due 4/5/2023.(Hayes, Michele) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Mon 03/13 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company must correct the following error(s): **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge , both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 3/10/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued 21 days as to ABM Industries, Inc., NIBCO, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/10 8:16 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel A. Quereshi. Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company or counsel for Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/24/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Insurance Company of Greater New York, Other Affiliate Strathmore Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Greater New York Insurance Companies, Other Affiliate GNY Custom Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Brite Insurance Agency for Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company.(Hayes, Michele) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10479278.), filed by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company.(Hayes, Michele) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |