Mendoza et al v. Giordano et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00376 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC
420 S Rampart Blvd #150
Las Vegas, NV 89145 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angelo Joseph Giordano
9808 Maidenfair Ct.
Las Vegas, NV 89148 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC
1850 E Sahara Ave., Ste 103
Las Vegas, NV 89104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Luis Mendoza
1850 E. Sahara Ave., Ste. 103 Las Vegas
Las Vegas, NV 89104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Osiris Haymee Vega
1850 E. Sahara Ave., Ste. 130
Las Vegas, NV 89104 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Thu 04/11 3:58 PM
ORDER Granting37 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Stipulation
Wed 04/10 3:00 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Defendants Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. (Beckstrom, James) (dismissal) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 02/29 12:36 PM
ORDER Denying without prejudice29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/28/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
minord
Minute Order
Tue 02/27 3:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/27/2024. Pending before the Court is an unauthorized surreply, Docket No.34 , but see Local Rule 7-2(b) ("Surreplies are not permitted without leave of court"), which is hereby STRICKEN. The Court has already ordered Plaintiffs' counsel to familiarize himself with the local rules. Docket No. 31. Continued violations of applicable rules or orders may result in the imposition of sanctions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) Modified to create link on 2/27/2024 (CJS) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response
Mon 02/26 10:17 PM
RESPONSE to29 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Jose Luis Mendoza, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC, Osiris Haymee Vega. Replies due by 3/4/2024. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply
Fri 02/23 12:47 PM
REPLY to Response to29 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. (Beckstrom, James) |
|
Sunday, February 18, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response
Sun 02/18 4:24 PM
RESPONSE to29 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Jose Luis Mendoza, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC, Osiris Haymee Vega. Replies due by 2/25/2024. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Stay Case
Mon 02/12 1:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/12/2024. Pending before the Court is a motion to extend, which counsel incorrectly docketed as a motion to stay discovery and appears to address a pending motion for sanctions. Docket No. 30. The motion also incorrectly identifies this Court as the local state court. See id. at 1. The filing is conclusory, convoluted, and procedurally improper. If Plaintiffs are attempting to use this filing as an opposition brief to the pending motion for discovery sanctions, then Plaintiffs must file a brief focused on that issue and docketed as a response. If Plaintiffs are attempting to use this filing to obtain an extension of the discovery cutoff, then Plaintiffs must file a request focused on that issue that addresses Local Rule 26-3 and is docketed as a motion to extend. The pending motion (Docket No. 30) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs' counsel must familiarize himself with the local rules. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) |
||
Sunday, February 11, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Motion Stay Case or Discovery
Sun 02/11 9:47 PM
First MOTION to Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs Jose Luis Mendoza, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC, Osiris Haymee Vega. Responses due by 2/25/2024. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Motion Dismiss
Wed 02/07 10:15 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2024. (Beckstrom, James) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 01/24 10:03 AM
ORDER denying ECF No.27 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/23/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Stipulation
Mon 01/22 3:35 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY CASE Stipulation and Order to Stay Case Pending Mediation by Defendants Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. (Beckstrom, James) (stay) (dispositive) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines)
Tue 10/10 1:57 PM
ORDER Denying24 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 2/12/2024. Motions due by 3/13/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/12/2024. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Tue 10/10 1:58 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (AMMi) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 10/09 11:58 AM
Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re23 Order by Plaintiffs Jose Luis Mendoza, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC, Osiris Haymee Vega.. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/02 12:48 PM
ORDER - A joint proposed discovery plan must be filed by October 9, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 08/14 11:01 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Beckstrom, James) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/14 10:00 AM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint 1 Complaint , Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/24/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/28/2023.(Beckstrom, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified to correct link on 8/14/2023 - NEF regenerated (CJS) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 07/28 1:32 PM
ORDER Granting19 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Angelo Joseph Giordano and Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC answer due 8/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation
Thu 07/27 10:41 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline re7 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. (Beckstrom, James) (extend) (answer) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/25 10:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Luis Mendoza, Osiris Haymee Vega, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/18 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Luis Mendoza, Osiris Haymee Vega, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC. Angelo Joseph Giordano served on 7/10/2023. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/10 2:42 PM
ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion to extend is GRANTED . The deadline to effectuate service is extended to November 1, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit
Fri 07/07 1:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT of In Support of Order Extending Time to Serve Summons and Complaint re12 Order on Ex Parte Motion,6 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Jose Luis Mendoza, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC, Osiris Haymee Vega.. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/06 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Luis Mendoza, Osiris Haymee Vega, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC. Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC served on 7/6/2023. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Notice 4m Dismissal
Wed 07/05 11:06 AM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * complaint * in this action was filed on * 3/9/2023. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 8/4/2023. (WJ) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Motion
Thu 06/15 8:46 AM
ORDER Denying11 Ex Parte Motion for Service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice Lis Pendens
Fri 05/05 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiffs Jose Luis Mendoza, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC, Osiris Haymee Vega. . (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Complaint Amended
Thu 03/23 12:35 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs by Jose Luis Mendoza, Osiris Haymee Vega, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC. No changes to parties. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memo of explanation regarding amended compliant | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 3:01 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angelo Joseph Giordano, Mexitalia Family Holdings, LLC. (JQC) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Objection Report and Recommendation
Thu 03/16 2:49 PM
OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Jose Luis Mendoza. Response to Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2023. (JQC) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Recusal
Mon 03/13 12:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on March 13, 2023. With good cause appearing, Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
||
notice
Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Mon 03/13 1:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-00376-RFB-NJK . (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 03/09 1:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jos Luis Mendoza, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC, Osiris Haymee Vega. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/09 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7230946) by Jos Luis Mendoza, Osiris Haymee Vega, Tequila Cien Rifles, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/19/2023. Proof of service due by 6/7/2023. (Huntsman, Rulon) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 03/09 1:55 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC) |