United States of America v. Olympia Health Care LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01783 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2345 Medicare Recovery |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MPT Operating Partnership, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MPT of Los Angeles, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MPT of Olympia, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medical Properties Trust, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Olympia Health Care LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laxman Reddy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeremy Redin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Williams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
46 | 46
![]() STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (McManus, Stanton) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
45 | 45
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Robert Kresse counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. John R. Kresse is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Kresse, John) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2025 | ||
44 | 44
![]() STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kresse, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
![]() STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kresse, John) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
![]() STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kresse, John) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stanton McManus on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attorney Stanton McManus added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(McManus, Stanton) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
![]() STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kresse, John) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
![]() STATUS REPORT , Joint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kresse, John) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
![]() STATUS REPORT Joint by Plaintiff and Defendants Olympia Health Care et al. filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kresse, John) |
|
37 | 37
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Evan S Strassberg on behalf of Defendants Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC, Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC, Olympia Health Care LLC, Laxman Reddy, Jeremy Redin, Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc., Matthew Williams (Attorney Evan S Strassberg added to party Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan S Strassberg added to party Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan S Strassberg added to party Olympia Health Care LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan S Strassberg added to party Laxman Reddy(pty:dft), Attorney Evan S Strassberg added to party Jeremy Redin(pty:dft), Attorney Evan S Strassberg added to party Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Evan S Strassberg added to party Matthew Williams(pty:dft))(Strassberg, Evan) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II :Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., and Medical Properties Trust,Inc.35 , and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE only as to Defendants MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., and Medical Properties Trust,Inc.; 2. The Scheduling Conference set for November 20, 2023, is VACATED; and3. The case REMAINS STAYED as to Defendants Olympia Health Care LLC; Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC; Sherman/Grayson Hospital, LLC; Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC; Laxman Reddy; Matthew Williams; and Jeremy Redin, and the first Joint Status Report is due on November 7, 2023. (lc) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
![]() STIPULATION to Dismiss defendants MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, Medical Properties Trust, Inc. filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Kresse, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
![]() ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE33 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1. The Scheduling Conference is reset for November 20, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. 2. The Parties must meet at least 21 days in advance of the Scheduling Conference to prepare a Joint Rule 26(f) Report for the Court.3. The Parties must submit the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no less than seven days before the Scheduling Conference. 4. No further extensions will be granted. (lc) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
![]() STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from October 2, 2023 to November 20, 2023 filed by Defendants MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, Medical Properties Trust, Inc..(Kidder, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR MPT DEFENDANTS TO RE31 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The time for Defendants MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., and Medical Properties Trust, Inc. to respond to the Complaint1 is extended from September 7, 2023 to October 23, 2023. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
![]() STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 23, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, Medical Properties Trust, Inc..(Kidder, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action is STAYED pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362, as to Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Olympia Health Care LLC; Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC; Sherman/Grayson Hospital, LLC; Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC; Laxman Reddy; Matthew Williams; and Jeremy Redin ("Alecto Defendants"), pending resolution of the bankruptcy and insurance coverage disputes. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kresse, John) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR MPT DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT27 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendants MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., and Medical Properties Trust, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended from July 24, 2023 to September 7, 2023. (lc) |
|
27 | 27
![]() STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 7, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, Medical Properties Trust, Inc..(Kidder, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the automatic stay associated with a Chapter 11 filing, as set forth at 11 USC 362, the Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer concerning the proposed handling of this action. After meeting and conferring, the parties shall submit a joint status report to the Court setting forth their proposal in light of the automatic stay. The parties shall file their status report on or before July 31, 2023. (lc) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings filed by Defendant Attorney Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc.. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings filed by Defendant Attorney Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE22 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Scheduling Conference is continued from July 17, 2023, to September 18, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. The Courts May 12, 2023, Order otherwise remains in effect. (lc) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() First STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 07/17/2023 to 09/18/2023 Re: Order,, Set/Reset Hearing,18 filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Kresse, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR MPT DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT20 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The time for Defendants MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., and Medical Properties Trust, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended from June 9, 2023 to July 24, 2023. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 24, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants MPT Operating Partnership, L.P., MPT of Los Angeles, L.P., MPT of Olympia, LLC, Medical Properties Trust, Inc..(Kidder, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC, Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC, Olympia Health Care LLC, Laxman Reddy, Jeremy Redin, Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc., Matthew Williams, (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
18 | 18
![]() ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for July 17, 2023 at 1:30 PM; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE:Defendants Olympia Health Care LLC, Alecto Healthcare Services LLC, Sherman/Grayson Hospital, LLC, Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman LLC, Laxman Reddy, Matthew Williams, and Jeremy Redin's Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
16 | 16
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC, Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC, Olympia Health Care LLC, Laxman Reddy, Jeremy Redin, Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc., Matthew Williams.(Attorney Uttam Singh Dhillon added to party Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Uttam Singh Dhillon added to party Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Uttam Singh Dhillon added to party Olympia Health Care LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Uttam Singh Dhillon added to party Laxman Reddy(pty:dft), Attorney Uttam Singh Dhillon added to party Jeremy Redin(pty:dft), Attorney Uttam Singh Dhillon added to party Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Uttam Singh Dhillon added to party Matthew Williams(pty:dft))(Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MPT Operating Partnership, L.P. answer now due 6/9/2023; Medical Properties Trust, Inc. answer now due 6/9/2023; MPT of Los Angeles, L.P. answer now due 6/9/2023; MPT of Olympia, LLC answer now due 6/9/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants MPT Operating Partnership, L.P.; Medical Properties Trust, Inc.; MPT of Los Angeles, L.P.; MPT of Olympia, LLC.(Attorney Samuel M Kidder added to party MPT Operating Partnership, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel M Kidder added to party MPT of Los Angeles, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel M Kidder added to party MPT of Olympia, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel M Kidder added to party Medical Properties Trust, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kidder, Samuel) |
|
14 | 14
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff United States of America. upon MPT Operating Partnership, L.P. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023; MPT of Los Angeles, L.P. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023; MPT of Olympia, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023; Medical Properties Trust, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Samuel M. Kidder. (Kresse, John) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Olympia Health Care LLC. upon Olympia Health Care LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Uttam Dhillon. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
12 | 12
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc.. upon Sherman Grayson Hospital, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Uttam Dhillon. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Laxman Reddy. upon Laxman Reddy waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Uttam Dhillon. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
10 | 10
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Matthew Williams. upon Matthew Williams waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Uttam Dhillon. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
9 | 9
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Jeremy Redin. upon Jeremy Redin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Uttam Dhillon. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
8 | 8
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC. upon Alecto Healthcare Services Sherman, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Uttam Dhillon. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
7 | 7
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC. upon Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Uttam Dhillon. (Dhillon, Uttam) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Courts Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney John Robert Kresse added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Kresse, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |