Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-00378
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:Nov 13, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, November 13, 2023
9 9 order Judgment Wed 11/15 8:11 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of John Does 1-10 against Wilbert Leslie. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
8 8 8 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Screening Order Wed 11/15 8:02 AM
SCREENING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Fourteenth Amendment Due Process Clause claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief could be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. This status doesn't relieve Leslie of his obligation to pay the full $350 filing fee under the statute; it just means that he can do it in installments. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Nevada Department of Corrections must pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, 20% of the preceding month's deposits to the account of Wilbert E. Leslie, #50357 (in months that the account exceeds $10) until the full $350 filing fee has been paid for this action. The Clerk is directed to SEND a copy of this order to (1) the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office and (2) the attention of Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections at formapauperis@doc.nv.gov. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now closed case. See order for further details. This case is now closed. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi - cc: copy of this Order sent to Chief of Inmate Services for the NDOC via email)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
7 7 cmp Complaint Amended Thu 08/10 12:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does 1-10 by Wilbert Leslie. Removes parties. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Wed 07/19 10:44 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs5 Motion for Enlargement of Time to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before August 7, 2023 , Plaintiff must file an amended complaint in compliance with the Courts June 22, 2023 Screening Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to file an amended complaint on or before August 7, 2023 , will result in a recommendation to dismiss this action without prejudice . A dismissal without prejudice allows Plaintiff to file his case with the Court, under a new case number, when he is able to comply with LSR 2-1 and file a complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must resend Plaintiff the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint, the information and instructions for filing the same, and a courtesy copy of the 4 Complaint. Complaint/Complaint form with instructions herein for distribution to P via HDSP Law Library . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/18/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Complaint Form
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
5 5 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 07/12 9:53 AM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to file Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Wilbert Leslie. Responses due by 7/26/2023. (DRM) (amend)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
3 3 order Screening Order Mon 06/26 3:42 PM
SCREENING ORDER. It is ordered that a decision on the1 application to proceed in forma pauperis is DEFERRED. It is further ordered that Plaintiff has until July 22, 2023 to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) and send Plaintiff Wilbert Leslie the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of his Complaint (ECF No. 1-1). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/22/2023. (copy of complaint sent to P)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1983 Complaint,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Complaint
Thursday, March 09, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 03/09 3:01 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CJS)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/09 2:59 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Wilbert Leslie.(CJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint