Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Cam Ferenbach
Case #: 2:23-cv-00380
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:Aug 10, 2023
Case in other court:Eight Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevad, A-23-864922-C
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By
Tabetha Martinez
Strongin Burger LLP
contact info
Susan Gillespie
Burger Meyer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Tabetha Martinez
Strongin Burger LLP
contact info
Susan Gillespie
Burger Meyer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Gurule
Represented By
Katie Lynn Cannata
Semenza Kircher Rickard
contact info
Christopher D Kircher
Semenza Kircher Rickard
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 10, 2023
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 08/11 3:56 PM
ORDER granting16 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that this case, including any and all claims brought by Plaintiff, is hereby dismissed with prejudice. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the Parties will bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/10/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Stipulation Thu 08/10 11:24 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc.. (Gillespie, Susan) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/11 3:59 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
minord Minute Order Wed 07/05 10:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/5/2023. Before the Court is the 14 Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff Maria Gurule and Defendants Walmart Inc. and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (collectively, "the Parties"). The Parties inform the Court that the matter has settled and they are finalizing settlement documents. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties must file dismissal documents no later than September 4, 2023, or else a joint status report informing the Court of the status of settlement. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
14 14 notice Notice Other Fri 06/30 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Maria Gurule.. (Kircher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
13 13 8 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Tue 05/23 4:36 PM
ORDER Granting12 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/23/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
12 12 motion Stipulated Protective Order Wed 05/17 2:05 PM
Proposed STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc... (Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 03/31 10:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/30/2023. Motions due by 9/29/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/31/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
10 10 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 03/30 3:19 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Maria Gurule.. (Kircher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Status Report Thu 03/30 3:17 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Maria Gurule.. (Kircher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/30 3:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maria Gurule. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Kircher, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
7 7 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 03/23 11:06 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc...(Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-8 in Support of Statement Re Removal
Friday, March 10, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 03/10 11:10 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Attorney Action Required Fri 03/10 11:01 AM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to2 Certificate of Interested Parties. Attorney Susan Gillespie advised to review document2 . The plaintiff named on page 2 of document does not match the name of the plaintiff on the case. Please file a corrected document. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 3/10/2023 COMPLIED (WJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
4 4 minord Minute Order Removal Case Fri 03/10 7:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/9/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/24/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/09 3:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc. d/b/a Wal-Mart. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Thu 03/09 3:53 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-864922-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7231563) by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Inc. d/b/a Wal-Mart. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/19/2023. (Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Answer,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Demand,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 NV SOS,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 AR SOS,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 NV SOS,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 AR SOS,
Att: 10 Declaration of Susan E. Gillespie,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 03/10 7:47 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (KF)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Fri 03/10 7:49 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]