California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 5:23-cv-00413
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:Sep 01, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Hesperia 2011, LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Dennis Cooper
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 31, 2023
18 18 2 pgs notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 08/31 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Dennis Cooper. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
17 17 4 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 08/22 11:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Minute Order (1) DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 13); and (2) Imposing Sanction on Plaintiff for Failure to Respond to Order to Show Cause13 . If Plaintiff chooses to file a motion for default judgment, he must file one within 14 days of the issuance of this order. The Court will find any motion filed after that deadline untimely and deny it on that basis. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 08/11 9:31 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Hesperia 2011, LLC (lom)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Clerk to Enter Default Fri 08/11 9:04 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Hesperia 2011, LLC filed by Plaintiff Dennis Cooper. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 08/11 9:03 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dennis Cooper, upon Defendant Hesperia 2011, LLC served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joseph Michael, as agent for service of process, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 08/01 12:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/10/2023. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/10 11:55 AM
Notice Intent to Proceed With Action filed by Plaintiff Dennis Cooper. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 04/03 2:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) DECLINING Supplemental Jurisdiction; (2) DISMISSING Plaintiffs State Law Claims (Causes of Action 2-5); and (3) ORDERING Plaintiff to File Notice of Intention to Proceed or Voluntary Dismissal. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice either indicating his intent to proceed with this case on the ADA claim alone, or voluntarily dismissing the action to enable hearing all his claims in state court, by April 10, 2023. Plaintiff is forewarned that failure to file notice by this deadline may be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
10 10 misc Response Wed 03/22 11:24 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Dennis Cooperto Order to Show Cause,,9 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Monday, March 13, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/13 4:32 PM
MINUTES Order to Show Cause (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this OSC no later than Wednesday, March 22, 2023. Failure to timely and adequately respond to this OSC may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state-law claims, if any, and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28: 1367. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 11:25 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Hesperia 2011, LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 11:15 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/13 11:14 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 03/09 4:28 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Dennis Cooper. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/09 4:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/09 4:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dennis Cooper. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34929776 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Dennis Cooper(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]