California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:23-cv-01796
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Farmers Group Inc.
6301 Owensmouth Avenue
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Frank A Magnanimo
Tharpe And Howell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Farmers Insurance Exchange
6301 Owensmouth Avenue
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
David Ronald Rutan
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Eve Tilley-Coulson
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Amin H Al-Sarraf
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Nina Huerta
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fire Insurance Exchange
6301 Owensmouth Avenue
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
David Ronald Rutan
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Eve Tilley-Coulson
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Amin H Al-Sarraf
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Nina Huerta
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Defendant
Truck Insurance Exchange
6301 Owensmouth Avenue
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
David Ronald Rutan
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Eve Tilley-Coulson
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Amin H Al-Sarraf
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Nina Huerta
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
James Ruffulo
Represented By
Matthew T Hale
Shegerian And Associates Inc
contact info
Anthony Nguyen
Shegerian And Associates Inc
contact info
Seth R. Lesser
Klafter Lesser LLP
contact info
Robert William Reed
Shegerian And Associates Inc
contact info
Seth Lesser
Klafter Lesser LLP
contact info
Carney R Shegerian
Shegerian And Associates Inc
contact info
Jeffrey A Klafter
Klafter Olsen And Lesser LLP
contact info
Sarah Sears
Klafter Lesser LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Yankus
Represented By
Matthew T Hale
Shegerian And Associates Inc
contact info
Anthony Nguyen
Shegerian And Associates Inc
contact info
Seth R. Lesser
Klafter Lesser LLP
contact info
Robert William Reed
Shegerian And Associates Inc
contact info
Seth Lesser
Klafter Lesser LLP
contact info
Carney R Shegerian
Shegerian And Associates Inc
contact info
Jeffrey A Klafter
Klafter Olsen And Lesser LLP
contact info
Sarah Sears
Klafter Lesser LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
89 89 motion Certify Thu 05/08 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Order Denying Motion to Dismiss for Immediate Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Huerta, Nina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Nina Huerta in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
88 88 2 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 05/08 9:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS GRANTING STIPULATION87 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 1/5/2026, a motion for class certification shall be filed. *See order for continued deadlines.* (vdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
87 87 stip Continue Thu 05/01 3:12 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Deadlines in Scheduling Order by 90 Days filed by Defendants Farmers Group Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange.(Huerta, Nina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
86 86 order Substitute Attorney Thu 05/01 9:44 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF Attorney by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting85 Request to Substitute Attorney. (chk)
Related: [-]