Portia Mason v. Kreaters, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00431 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kreaters, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Portia Mason
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)13 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kreaters, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2023, filed by Attorney for Defendant Kreaters, Inc..(Attorney Michael Joseph Karlin added to party Kreaters, Inc.(pty:dft))(Karlin, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Portia Mason, upon Defendant Kreaters, Inc. served on 3/30/2023, answer due 4/20/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kazutoshi Toe, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Shining, Carolin) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carolin K Shining counsel for Plaintiff Portia Mason. Binyamin I. Manoucheri is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Shining, Carolin) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carolin K Shining on behalf of Plaintiff Portia Mason (Attorney Carolin K Shining added to party Portia Mason(pty:pla))(Shining, Carolin) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp) |
|
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Kreaters, Inc. (et) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Manoucheri, Binyamin) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Manoucheri, Binyamin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason, (Manoucheri, Binyamin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34930533 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Attorney Binyamin I Manoucheri added to party Portia Mason(pty:pla))(Manoucheri, Binyamin) |