California Central District Court
Judge:Cormac J Carney
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:23-cv-00431
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:May 25, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 05, 2023 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Kreaters, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Karlin
Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Portia Mason
Represented By
Thiago Merlini Coelho
Wilshire Law Firm
contact info
Binyamin I Manoucheri
Wilshire Law Firm
contact info
Carolin K Shining
Wilshire Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 25, 2023
14 14 order Dismissing Case Thu 05/25 11:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)13 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 04/20 10:47 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kreaters, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2023, filed by Attorney for Defendant Kreaters, Inc..(Attorney Michael Joseph Karlin added to party Kreaters, Inc.(pty:dft))(Karlin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 03/31 4:53 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Portia Mason, upon Defendant Kreaters, Inc. served on 3/30/2023, answer due 4/20/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kazutoshi Toe, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Shining, Carolin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 03/17 4:39 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carolin K Shining counsel for Plaintiff Portia Mason. Binyamin I. Manoucheri is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Shining, Carolin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
10 10 notice Appearance Thu 03/16 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carolin K Shining on behalf of Plaintiff Portia Mason (Attorney Carolin K Shining added to party Portia Mason(pty:pla))(Shining, Carolin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/13 9:15 AM
ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 8:09 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Kreaters, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 8:06 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/13 8:06 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 8:05 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 03/09 5:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Manoucheri, Binyamin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/09 5:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Manoucheri, Binyamin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/09 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason, (Manoucheri, Binyamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34930533 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Attorney Binyamin I Manoucheri added to party Portia Mason(pty:pla))(Manoucheri, Binyamin)
Related: [-]