Original Case: 1:22-cv-00432

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-03204
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2023
Terminated:May 19, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 22, 2025 9:08 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION, an Ohio Corporation
Represented By
Robert Francis Ware
Thompson Hine
contact info
Defendant - Appellee Cross-Appellant
PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, an Ohio Corporation
Represented By
Robert Francis Ware
Thompson Hine
contact info
James L. Butler Jr.
Thompson Hine
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BORGWARNER PDS IRAPUATO S. DE R.L. DE C.V., a Mexican Corporation
Represented By
Adam Troy Ratliff
Warner, Norcross & Judd
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant Cross-Appellee
BORGWARNER PDS IRAPUATO S. DE R.L. DE C.V., a Mexican Corporation
Represented By
Adam Troy Ratliff
Warner, Norcross & Judd
contact info
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd
contact info
Michael G. Brady
Warner, Norcross & Judd
contact info

GPO May 19 2025
UNPUBLISHED OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : REVERSED and REMANDED. Mandate to issue. Decision not for publication. Eugene E. Siler, Jr., John B. Nalbandian (AUTHORING), and Stephanie Dawkins Davis (DISSENTING), Circuit Judges. [23-3204, 23-3237]

Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 9:08 AM CDT
Thursday, March 09, 2023
The case manager for this case is: Jennifer Strobel (JAS)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant BorgWarner PDS Irapuato S. de R.L. de C.V.. Transcript needed: y. (JAS)
Related: [-]