Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth W Hanes
Referred: Lawrence R Leonard
Case #: 2:23-cv-00087
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
appeal Supplemental Paper Record Transmitted to 4CCA Tue 01/28 10:18 AM
Supplemental Record on Appeal (Volumes 1-2 State Court Records) transmitted to US Court of Appeals re35 Notice of Appeal (alet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
misc State Court Records Returned/Received Thu 11/14 4:26 PM
State Court Records Returned as to the Supreme Court of Virginia, Court of Appeals of Virginia, and Virginia Beach Circuit Court. (alet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
38 38 misc Docket Annotation Fri 11/01 11:23 AM
SECOND NOTICE OF APPEAL by Brian J. Talbot. (jmey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
37 37 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 10/30 4:37 PM
USCA Case Number 24-7026 - Ashley Brownlee, Case Manager for35 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian J. Talbot. (jmey)
Related: [-]
appeal Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA Wed 10/30 4:46 PM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re35 Notice of Appeal. (jmey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
36 36 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA Tue 10/22 2:07 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re35 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (jmey) (Main Document 36 replaced on 10/22/2024) (jmey, )
Related: [-]
35 35 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 10/22 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to33 Final Order by Brian J. Talbot. Filing fee $ 0.00. (jmey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
34 34 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 09/24 12:03 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2024. (jmey)
Related: [-]
33 33 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 09/24 12:00 PM
FINAL ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Court ADOPTS and APPROVES the findings set forth in the31 Report and Recommendation. It is, therefore, ORDERED that the Respondent's23 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, Petitioner's30 Motion to Grant Relief be DENIED, and that the1 Petition be DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of the Respondent. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Petitioner is ADVISED that he may seek a certificate from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit by filing a written notice of appeal with the Clerk of the United States District Court, United States Courthouse, 600 Granby Street, Norfolk, Virginia 23510 within thirty (30) days. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 9/24/2024. Copies mailed 9/24/2024. (jmey)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
32 32 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Tue 08/20 9:05 AM
OBJECTION to31 Report and Recommendations by Brian J. Talbot. (jmey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, July 12, 2024
31 31 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 07/12 4:12 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re30 MOTION to Grant Relief,23 MOTION to Dismiss,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254). Objections to R&R Deadline 7/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 7/12/2024. Copies mailed 7/12/2024. (jmey)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Tue 01/09 12:37 PM
MOTION to Grant Relief by Brian J. Talbot.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, December 28, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/28 2:57 PM
ORDER.26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED. Petitioner's new deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is January 4, 2024. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward a copy of this Order to Petitioner and counsel of record for the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 12/28/2023. Copies mailed 12/28/2023. (jmey, ) (Main Document 29 replaced on 12/28/2023) (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
28 28 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Wed 12/27 1:19 PM
Amendment to26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Brian J. Talbotas.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
27 27 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 12/27 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian J. Talbot.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
utility Motions Referred Wed 12/27 8:48 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge:26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/08 3:33 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Dismiss by Brian J. Talbot.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, November 17, 2023
25 25 respoth Brief in Support Fri 11/17 4:17 PM
Brief in Support to22 Response to Habeas Petition,23 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. filed by Chadwick Dotson.(Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C1,
Att: 4 Exhibit C2,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 ECF 1 and 11
24 24 misc Roseboro Notice Fri 11/17 2:13 PM
Roseboro Notice by Chadwick Dotson (Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss Fri 11/17 2:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. by Chadwick Dotson. (Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Response to Habeas Petition Fri 11/17 2:07 PM
Rule 5 Answer RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Chadwick Dotson.(Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 11/01 3:46 PM
ORDER.20 Motion to Substitute Party is GRANTED. The Clerk shall substitute Chadwick Dotson for Harold W. Clarke as the Respondent in this matter. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward a copy of this Order to Petitioner and counsel of record for the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 11/1/2023. Copies mailed 11/1/2023. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
20 20 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/31 2:13 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Harold W. Clarke. (Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/31 12:30 PM
ORDER.18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED. Respondent's new deadline is November 17, 2023. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward a copy of this Order to the Petitioner and counsel of record for the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 10/31/2023. Copies mailed 10/31/2023. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/13 2:21 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) by Harold W. Clarke. (Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
misc State Court Records Returned/Received Thu 10/05 11:07 AM
State Court Records received from the Court of Appeals of Virginia and forwarded to Judge Leonard. (Tlev, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
misc State Court Records Returned/Received Thu 10/05 9:57 AM
State Court Records received from Virginia Beach Circuit Court and forwarded to Judge Leonard. (Tlev, )
Related: [-]
misc State Court Records Returned/Received Thu 10/05 10:04 AM
State Court Records received from the Supreme Court of Virginia and forwarded to Judge Leonard. (Tlev, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/20 2:16 PM
ORDER.15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED. Respondent must file an Answer on or before October 18, 2023. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Petitioner and counsel of record for the Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/20/2023. Copies mailed 9/20/2023. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
16 16 respoth Response Other Mon 09/18 11:43 AM
Response to12 Order of Prisoner Service (2254), filed by Harold W. Clarke. (Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 09/18 11:35 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Order of Prisoner Service (2254), by Harold W. Clarke. (Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/15 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Seidel Richmond on behalf of Harold W. Clarke (Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
notice Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 09/15 3:07 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF Receipt as to12 Order of Prisoner Service (2254),11 Order of Prisoner Service (2254),, filed by Harold W. Clarke. (Richmond, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (2254) Fri 09/08 1:42 PM
ORDER: Respondent is hereby ORDERED to show cause, within 10 days of the date of this order, why an answer has not been filed in this case. Copies of this Order sent as DIRECTED on 9.8.23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard and filed on 9/8/23. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
11 11 5 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (2254) Wed 07/19 10:04 AM
ORDER of Service (2254) upon respondents.2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma Pauperis is GRANTED and it is ORDERED that the petition be filed. The Respondent is ORDERED to file within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order an answer to the petition conforming to the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, together with the attachments specified in Rule 5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 7/19/2023. Copies mailed 7/19/2023.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 07/03 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian J. Talbot.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 17, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/18 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian J. Talbot.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
8 8 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 04/11 2:19 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (epri, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Thu 03/30 2:46 PM
Letter to Administrator, Virginia Beach Correctional Center. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Wed 03/29 12:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by Brian J. Talbot.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, March 27, 2023
5 5 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/27 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by Brian J. Talbot.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, March 16, 2023
4 4 misc Letter Mon 03/20 11:36 AM
Submission by Petitioner. Related [+](jmey, )
Related: [-] 1 Petition
Att: 1 Attachment Part 1,
Att: 2 Attachment Part 2,
Att: 3 Envelope
Friday, March 10, 2023
3 3 utility Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 03/10 11:26 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/10 11:05 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian J. Talbot. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Fri 03/10 11:04 AM
PETITION, Conditionally filed for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Brian J. Talbot.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Letter,
Att: 3 Envelope