Tamara Wareka v. Beauty Bar Medical Clinic Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01800 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 1:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Beauty Bar Medical Clinic Inc
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Tamara Wareka
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 09/12 2:15 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE MOTION for Extension of Time19 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time Dkt.19 . The Plaintiff's request that the court enter an order extending the date by which Plaintiff may reopen case, until October 15, 2023 is granted. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 09/11 1:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Time to Reopen Action filed by Plaintiff Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 07/13 11:06 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CASE DUE TO SETTLEMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court has been advised that this action has been settled. Accordingly, it is ordered that the action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction for 60 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action on a showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed and further proceedings are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Settlement
Mon 07/10 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Response
Thu 06/22 3:05 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Tamara Warekato Order to Show Cause15 (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 06/08 12:05 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/22/2023. (pk) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Tue 05/16 10:26 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/28/2023 re Complaint12 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The document is accepted as filed. (pk) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 05/16 7:14 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/28/2023 re Complaint12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend Time to File Answer
Fri 05/12 12:57 PM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/28/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/17 1:23 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tamara Wareka, upon Defendant Beauty Bar Medical Clinic Inc served on 4/7/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ash Elleish, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/10 4:00 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 3:30 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Beauty Bar Medical Clinic Inc. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/10 3:25 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 3:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/10 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/10 10:12 AM
Notice OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Fri 03/10 10:10 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/10 10:10 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/10 10:08 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Higbee, Mathew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/10 10:05 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34932749 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS. (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party TAMARA WAREKA p/k/a TAMARA WILLIAMS(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-C |