California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 5:23-cv-00416
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Shaina C St John
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Joanne I. Osinoff
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Susan M. Benson
Benson Legal Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
19 19 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/26 4:24 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re Stipulation18 . (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
18 18 stip Dismiss Case Fri 09/22 3:32 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Defendant United States of America.(St John, Shaina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 09/19 10:17 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Notice of Tentative Settlement filed September 18, 2023 (Dkt. No.16 ), indicating that the case has tentatively settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By November 17, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of November 18, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
16 16 notice Settlement Mon 09/18 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Settlement And Joint Request To Vacate All Dates Set In The Case filed by Defendant United States of America.(St John, Shaina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 24, 2023
15 15 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 08/24 10:10 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (tc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/17 11:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(St John, Shaina)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
13 13 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 06/12 4:49 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), by Judge Jesus G. Bernal12 . Defendant United States of America answer due 7/17/2023. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 06/07 2:02 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 7/17/23 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Attorney Shaina C St John added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(St John, Shaina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 05, 2023
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 05/05 10:40 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 6/14/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Attorney Joanne I. Osinoff added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Osinoff, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
10 10 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Wed 03/29 2:17 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, upon Defendant United States of America served on 3/16/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flavia De La Rosa, Authorized to Accept. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E.A., Agent. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Benson, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/21 4:59 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/13 12:02 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant United States of America. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/13 12:00 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/13 12:00 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/13 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/10 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, identifying United States of America. (Benson, Susan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 03/10 9:19 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Benson, Susan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/10 9:17 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Benson, Susan)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/10 9:14 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34932084 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attorney Susan M. Benson added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Benson, Susan)
Related: [-]